EP2769313 - SYSTEM, METHOD, APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR CALCULATING A SAMPLED SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grishin, Alexey 4231 Rockridge Crescent West Vancouver, British Columbia V7W 1A9 / CA | For all designated states Zhirkov, Alexander 4231 Rockridge Crescent West Vancouver, British Columbia V7W 1A9 / CA | For all designated states Oraevsky, Alexey 4231 Rockridge Crescent West Vancouver, British Columbia V7W 1A9 / CA | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/35] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12841617.9 | 18.10.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012CA50744 | Priority number, date | US201161548396P | 18.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161548396 P | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013056375 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769313 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2769313 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/10, H03H17/06, // H03H17/02 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G06F17/10 (EP,US);
G06F17/142 (US);
H03H17/0282 (EP,US);
H03H17/0642 (EP,US);
H03H17/0213 (EP,US);
H03H2017/0298 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | G06F17/10, G06F17/14, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR BERECHNUNG EINES ABGETASTETEN SIGNALS | [2014/35] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR CALCULATING A SAMPLED SIGNAL | [2014/35] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR LE CALCUL D'UN SIGNAL ÉCHANTILLONNÉ | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 12.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 18.10.2016 | LU | 18.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | HR | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | HR | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - T. Moeller ET AL, "Evaluation and design of filters using a Taylor series expansion", IEEE Transactions on Visualization and Computer Graphics, vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1109/2945.597800, (19970101), pages 184 - 199, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpls/abs_all.jsp?arnumber=597800, (20150630), XP055199162 [A] 1-15 * 1 Introduction; page 184, column l - page 185, column l * * 3 Taylor Series Expansion of the Convolution Sum ; 3.1 Analysis ; 3.2 Normalization; page 186, column l - page 188, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2945.597800 | [A] - VESMA JUSSI ET AL, "Design of polynomial interpolation filters based on Taylor series", 9TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE (EUSIPCO 1998), IEEE, ISBN 978-960-7620-06-4, (19980908), pages 1 - 5, (20150420), XP032767322 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * 2. Implementation of polynomial-based interpolation filters ; 3. Filter design based on Taylor series.; page 1, column r - page 4, column l; figure 1 * | International search | [A]CA2305381 (IGNJATOVIC ALEKSANDAR [US]); | [X] - MOLLER, T. ET AL., "Classification and Local Error Estimation of Interpolation and Derivative Filters for Volume Rendering", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 SYMPOSIUM ON VOLUME VISUALIZATION, PISCATAWAY. NJ, USA, (199610), pages 71 - 78, XP055149728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SVV.1996.558045 | [X] - KRASZEWSKI, G., "Non-uniform Kernel Sampling in Audio Signal Resampler", (2005), pages 1 - 5, URL: www.teleiiifo.pb.edu.pl/luashaiVpliki/iloiluiliforiii-saillpliilg2005.pdf, (20121213), XP055149730 | [Y] - TREFETHEN, L. N., "Spectral Methods in Matlab", (20000517), pages 1 - 181, URL: http:/A\wv.mathworks.ii7downloads/Spectral%20Methods%20m%20MATLAB[www.mathworla.ir].pdf, (20121217), XP055160097 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1137/1.9780898719598 | [A] - UNSER, M. ET AL., "On the Approximation Power of Convolution-Based Least Squares Versus Interpolation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199707), vol. 45, no. 7, pages 1697 - 1711, XP011057860 | [A] - PARKER, J.A. ET AL., "Comparison of interpolating methods for image resampling", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, (198303), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 31 - 39, XP001189649 | by applicant | - T. MOELLER ET AL., "Evaluation and design of filters using a Taylor series expansion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (19970101), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/2945.597800, pages 184 - 199, XP055199162 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2945.597800 |