EP2764174 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A PLATE-LIKE CONSTRUCTION WITH A DOUBLE-WALL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uponor Infra Oy Äyritie 20 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOMQVIST, Gunnar c/o Oy KWH Pipe Ab P.O. Box 21 FI-65101 Vaasa / FI | 02 /
SILLANPÄÄ, Ari c/o Oy KWH Pipe Ab P.O. Box 21 FI-65101 Vaasa / FI | 03 /
SÖDERGÅRD, Henry c/o Oy KWH Pipe Ab P.O. Box 21 FI-65101 Vaasa / FI | 04 /
TAYLOR, Ted c/o KWH Pipe (Canada) Ltd 6507 Mississauga Rd Mississauga, Ontario L5N 1A6 / CA | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12842142.7 | 17.10.2012 | [2018/14] | WO2012FI50999 | Priority number, date | FI20110006026 | 17.10.2011 Original published format: FI 20116026 | [2014/33] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013057373 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2764174 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2764174 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/42, B29C65/02, B29C65/00, E04C2/40, B29C65/48, B29C65/54, B29L31/00, B23K20/12, B23K9/02, B29C65/06, B29C65/20, B29C65/52, B29L31/30, B23K101/04 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
B23K9/02 (EP,US);
E04C2/40 (FI,US);
B23K20/129 (EP,US);
B29C48/156 (EP);
B29C65/00 (FI,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,FI,US);
B29C65/42 (EP,FI,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C65/525 (EP,US);
B29C65/542 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/345 (EP,US);
B29C66/524 (EP,US);
B29C66/72523 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/836 (EP,US);
B29C66/8432 (EP,US);
B23K2101/045 (EP,US);
B29C48/0021 (EP);
B29C48/07 (EP);
B29C48/11 (EP);
B29C65/06 (EP,US);
B29C65/20 (EP,US);
B29C66/00141 (EP,US);
B29C66/022 (EP,US);
B29C66/0242 (EP,US);
B29C66/5227 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/721 (EP,US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/73941 (EP,US);
B29L2031/307 (EP,US);
B29L2031/776 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/065 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0683 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2055/02 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2015/35] | B29C65/42, B29C65/02, B29C65/00, E04C2/40, // B29C65/06 | ||
Former IPC [2014/33] | E04C2/40, B29C65/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PLATTENARTIGEN KONSTRUKTION MIT DOPPELWANDSTRUKTUR | [2014/33] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A PLATE-LIKE CONSTRUCTION WITH A DOUBLE-WALL STRUCTURE | [2014/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CONSTRUCTION DE TYPE PLAQUES POURVUE D'UNE STRUCTURE À DOUBLE PAROI | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 22.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2012 | AL | 04.04.2018 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | LU | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MK | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]NL91905C (N.V. BRONSWERK) [I] 1,2,7-10,12-16* figure 1 *; | [XI]US3312579 (YASHA HEIFETZ) [X] 14,15 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 11; figure 5 * * column 1, lines 26-32 * [I] 1,2,7-10,12,13,16; | [XI]JPS5120290 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 14 * figures 2,3 * [I] 1,2,5-8,10,12,13,15,16; | [XI]JPS5281386 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,12-15 * figures 3,4,1 * [I] 4,5,9,16; | [XI]US2005263244 (HENDERSON RANDAL [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * figure 1 * [I] 1,2,9,12,13,16 | International search | [Y]US3279971 (GARDENER REGINALD H); | [Y]US4755408 (NOEL GERT [BE]); | [X]EP0893189 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [X]JP2008214865 (TAKIRON CO); | [Y]WO2010000941 (KWH PIPE AB OY [FI], et al) |