EP2685867 - ADJUSTABLE DESKTOP PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varidesk, LLC 117 Wrangler Drive Coppell, TX 75019 / US | [2017/08] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Gemmy Industries Corporation 117 Wrangler Coppell, TX 75019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLAHERTY, Daniel G. 117 Wrangler Drive Coppell, TX 75019 / US | 02 /
WANG, Sheng Chien No. 6 Yung Hung Lane Hou An Vil Jen Wu Dist. Kaohsiung / TW | [2023/11] |
Former [2014/04] | 01 /
FLAHERTY, Daniel, G. 117 Wrangler Drive Coppell, TX 75019 / US | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [2023/11] |
Former [2014/04] | Manley, Nicholas Michael WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 12842684.8 | 30.07.2012 | [2023/11] | WO2012US48775 | Priority number, date | US201261651101P | 24.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261651101 P | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013176690 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685867 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2685867 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47B9/00, A47B9/18, A47B21/00, A47B21/02, A47B21/04 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
A47B9/18 (EP,KR,US);
A47B9/00 (EP,KR,US);
A47B9/16 (US);
A47B21/00 (EP,US);
A47B21/02 (EP,US);
A47B21/03 (US);
A47B21/0314 (US);
A47B21/04 (EP,KR,US);
A47B2009/006 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | A47B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARE DESKTOPPLATTFORM | [2014/04] | English: | ADJUSTABLE DESKTOP PLATFORM | [2014/04] | French: | PLATEFORME DE BUREAU RÉGLABLE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2022 | 09.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2020 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | IE | 30.07.2023 | LU | 30.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2545515 (GANNETT WRIGHT K, et al) [X] 6-9,14,15 * the whole document *[I] 10,11; | [Y]US5823120 (HOLMQUIST ROLAND [SE]) [Y] 6-11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005039643 (DAILEY GEORGE WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 6-11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007163475 (MURPHY MARCUS L [US]) [A] 6-11,14,15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5681034 (NONIEWICZ ZBIGNIEW [DE]); | [Y]US5823120 (HOLMQUIST ROLAND [SE]); | [Y]US2005039643 (DAILEY GEORGE WILLIAM [US]); | [Y]US2007163475 (MURPHY MARCUS L [US]); | [A]US2008203865 (CHOUINARD GUY [CA], et al); | [Y]US2011155023 (KRAUSE STEVEN T [US], et al) | by applicant | US2545515 | US5823120 | US2005039643 |