EP2771012 - NEW COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property (No. 2) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2016/21] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Glaxosmithkline Intellectual Property (No. 2) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRICKSON, Thomas, Francis 5852 Crest Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
HO, Koc-Kan 2836 Valley View Avenue Holladay, UT 84417 / US | 03 /
SAUNDERS, Michael, David 10864 Berrywood Court Sandy, UT 84070 / US | 04 /
STEVENS, Brian, John 1766 East Princeton Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | 05 /
SWIERCZEK, Krzysztof 7843 Tiger Court West Jordan, UT 84081 / US | 06 /
WRIGHT, Kevin, Bret 9018 Kings Hill Place Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121 / US | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Reed, Michael Antony GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2014/36] | Application number, filing date | 12843835.5 | 23.10.2012 | WO2012US61439 | Priority number, date | US201161550679P | 24.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161550679 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013062943 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771012 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/52, C07D473/34, C07H19/16, A61P35/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
C07D473/34 (EP,US);
C07H19/16 (US);
A61K31/7052 (EP,US);
A61K31/706 (EP,US);
A61K31/7064 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | A61K31/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | 22.04.2014 | ME | 22.04.2014 | Title | German: | NEUE VERBINDUNGEN | [2014/36] | English: | NEW COMPOUNDS | [2014/36] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0140799 (CV THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,14 * pages 8f; formula 1; compounds (27) and (28) in example 4 on pages 54f *; | [X]WO03074083 (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,13-15 * the whole document, in particular the claims; examples 2(B)6, 2(B)14, 2(F)3, 2(F)16, 2(F)19, 2(G)9, 2(G)61, 2(G)69 *; | [X]WO2004016635 (CV THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,13,14 * in particular claims 1 and 20; example 9; page 55 *; | [X]WO2007067559 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10,13,14 * claims; compounds 139 and 146 in examples 15 and 16 and in schemes 16 and 17 *; | [X] - KUNG P P ET AL, "Design, synthesis, and biological evaluation of novel human 5'-deoxy-5'-methylthioadenosine phosphorylase (MTAP) substrates", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 15, no. 11, ISSN 0960-894X, (20050602), pages 2829 - 2833, (20050602), XP027801098 [X] 1-4,6,10,14,15 * the whole document, in particular second paragraph in right-hand column on page 2832; compounds 17 and 24 in table 2 * | [X] - MALIK A ET AL., "Coumaroyl Adenosine and Lignan Glycoside from Amaranthus spinosus L.", POLISH JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 80, pages 259 - 263, XP002739312 [X] 1-3,7,10,13,14 * compound 2 on pages 260-263; page 259 first paragraph; page 263 "extraction and isolation" * | [X] - MORIS F ET AL, "A USEFUL AND VERSATILE PROCEDURE FOR THE ACYLATION OF NUCLEOSIDES THROUGH AN ENZYMIC REACTION", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19930101), vol. 58, no. 3, doi:10.1021/JO00055A018, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 653 - 660, XP009054627 [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * schemes I and II; entry 8 in table III, entry 3h in table IV and entries 7g and 7h in table VII as well as on pages 658-660 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00055a018 | [X] - ANDREW MARSH ET AL, "Atom Transfer Polymerization: Use of Uridine and Adenosine Derivatized Monomers and Initiators", MACROMOLECULES, (19991201), vol. 32, no. 26, doi:10.1021/ma991438q, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 8725 - 8731, XP055187711 [X] 1-3,7,10 * compound 5 in figures 1,2 and on page 8726 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma991438q | [X] - AFZAL KHAN ET AL, "Hydrogen Bond Template-Directed Polymerization of Protected 5'-Acryloylnucleosides", MACROMOLECULES, (19991001), vol. 32, no. 20, doi:10.1021/ma990283j, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 6560 - 6564, XP055187885 [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * scheme 1 with B=adenine; page 6561, left-hand column, third paragraph; second pararaph on the right-hand column of the same page * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma990283j | [X] - TAKAMURA T ET AL, "Synthesis and antitumor activities of N6,N6-dimethyladenosine carboxylate analogues", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JP, (19890101), vol. 37, no. 10, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 2828 - 2831, XP002181857 [X] 1,2,10,14,15 * compound 3q in chart 1, table I and right-hand column on page 2830; table II a) * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20020905), Database accession no. 446850631, XP002739313 [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * compound with registry number 446850-63-1 * | International search | [Y]US2008132525 (WAHHAB AMAL [CA], et al); | [Y] - SIEDLECKI ET AL., "Establishment and functional validation of a structural homology model for human DNA methyltransferase 1", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (20030627), vol. 306, no. 2, pages 558 - 563, XP055066318 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(03)01000-3 | [A] - COHEN ET AL., "Determinants of cofactor binding to DNA methyltransferases: insights from a systematic series of structural variants of S-adenosylhomocysteine", ORG.BIOMOL.CHEM., (2005), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 152 - 161, XP002412376 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b415446k | [A] - YANG ET AL., "Structure of the bacteriophage T4DNA adenine methyltransferase", NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (200310), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 849 - 855, XP008119541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nsb973 |