EP2775749 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Kugo c/o Kyocera Corporation Head Office 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
YAMAZAKI, Chiharu c/o Kyocera Corporation Head Office 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12844925.3 | 02.11.2012 | WO2012JP78519 | Priority number, date | US201161555234P | 03.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161555234 P | [2014/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013065838 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775749 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/06, H04W36/20, // H04W36/00, H04W72/12, H04W84/04, H04W16/32, H04W16/14 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0032 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (US);
H04J11/0056 (EP,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,US);
H04L5/0073 (EP,US);
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04W36/20 (EP,US);
H04B17/24 (EP,US);
H04B17/345 (EP,US);
H04W16/32 (EP,US);
H04W36/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | H04W16/16, H04W36/20, H04W52/24, H04W72/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2014/37] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2014/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2014 | Translation filed | 06.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 22.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010084987 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [P]EP2391168 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0071]; figure 9 *; | [I] - ETRI, "Solutions for the macro-pico interference scenario", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-112439_SOLUTIONS_FOR_THE_MACRO-PICO_INTERFERENCE_SCENARIO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110930), vol. RAN WG3, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050542122 [I] 1-7 * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 37 * | [A] - KYOCERA CORP, "Carrier-based HetNet ICIC", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-112611, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111001), vol. RAN WG3, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050542309 [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 29 * | International search | [A]JP2003032724 (NEC CORP); | [A]WO2010079824 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al); | [A]JP2010171885 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [A]WO2010117235 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]WO2011021388 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011101344 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A] - ERICSSON, "On Inter-cell Interference Coordination Schemes without/with Traffic Load Indication", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 MEETING #49-BIS R1-073039, (20070625), page 2, XP050106698 |