EP2778311 - STRUCTURE HAVING A CORE BAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fawoo Engineering Co., Ltd. 35-3 Ojeong-ro 211 beon-gil Ojeong-gu Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 421-814 / KR | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states Fawoo Engineering Co., Ltd. 35-3 Ojeong-ro 211 beon-gil Ojeong-gu Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 421-814 / KR | ||
For all designated states Yoo, Young Ho 422-1001 Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt. 214 Dangsan-ro Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | |||
For all designated states Yoo, Taegeun 422-1001Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | |||
For all designated states Yoo, A Ram 422-1001Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | |||
For all designated states Kim, Sang Sik 16-1901 Songrim-ro 13 Yuseong-gu Daejeon, Daejeon 305-759 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Young Ho 422-1001(Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt) Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | 02 /
YOO, Taegeun 422-1001(Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt) Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | 03 /
YOO, A Ram 422-1001(Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt) Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Sang Sik (Noeun-dong, Yeolmae Maeul 9 Danji) 1802ho, 901dong, 56, Eungubinam-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-768 / KR | [2015/04] |
Former [2014/38] | 01 /
YOO, Young Ho 422-1001(Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt) Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | ||
02 /
YOO, Taegeun 422-1001(Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt) Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | |||
03 /
YOO, A Ram 422-1001(Dangsan Samsung Raemian Apt) Dangsan-ro 214 Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-771 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Sang Sik 16-1901 Songrim-ro 13 Yuseong-gu Daejeon Daejeon 305-759 / KR | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12845129.1 | 31.10.2012 | WO2012KR09031 | Priority number, date | KR20110114864 | 06.11.2011 Original published format: KR 20110114864 | KR20120005300 | 17.01.2012 Original published format: KR 20120005300 | [2014/38] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013066032 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2778311 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04C3/00, E04B1/18, E04B1/32, E04B7/08 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
E04C3/29 (EP,US);
E04C3/00 (US);
E04C3/292 (EP,US);
E04C3/46 (EP,US);
E04B1/3205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR MIT EINER STOPFENSTANGE | [2014/38] | English: | STRUCTURE HAVING A CORE BAR | [2014/38] | French: | STRUCTURE AYANT UNE BARRE D'ÂME | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2014 | Translation filed | 30.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 02.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH05176656 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]JPH10205065 (IWANO TOSHIO); | [A]JPH10325210 (MITSUBOSHI KK, et al); | [Y]JP2938066B (NAGAI YOSHIMASA ET AL.); | [A]KR20020068636 (HUR HEYNG MAN [KR]); | [Y]JP3130275U (MEGUMI CHEN); | [Y]KR20090124841 (HAN JEONG HWA [KR]) |