EP2775303 - METHOD FOR DETECTING CHRONIC SINUSITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saga University 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi, Saga 840-8502 / JP | For all designated states Yamagata University 1-4-12, Kojirakawamachi Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-8560 / JP | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZUHARA, Kenji c/o SAGA UNIVERSITY 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi Saga 840-8502 / JP | 02 /
OHTA, Shoichiro c/o SAGA UNIVERSITY 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi Saga 840-8502 / JP | 03 /
ARIMA, Kazuhiko c/o SAGA UNIVERSITY 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi Saga 840-8502 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAISHI, Hiroshi c/o SAGAUNIVERSITY 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi Saga 840-8502 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Shoichi c/o SAGA UNIVERSITY 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi Saga 840-8502 / JP | 06 /
OHTA, Nobuo c/o Yamagata University Faculty of Medicine 2-2-2 Iida-Nishi Yamagata-shi Yamagata 990-9585 / JP | 07 /
ISHIDA, Akihiro c/o Yamagata University Faculty of Medicine 2-2-2 Iida-Nishi Yamagata-shi Yamagata 990-9585 / JP | 08 /
SUZUKI, Yusuke c/o Yamagata University Faculty of Medicine 2-2-2 Iida-Nishi Yamagata-shi Yamagata 990-9585 / JP | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/37] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12845463.4 | 30.10.2012 | [2016/48] | WO2012JP78008 | Priority number, date | JP20110238913 | 31.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011238913 | [2014/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013065671 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775303 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2775303 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (US);
G01N2800/14 (EP,US);
G01N2800/7095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | G01N33/53, C07K14/47, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON CHRONISCHER SINUSITIS | [2014/37] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING CHRONIC SINUSITIS | [2014/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE SINUSITE CHRONIQUE | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2014 | Translation filed | 27.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 04.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2012 | AL | 30.11.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - BEN, Q-W., ET AL, "Circulating levels of periostin may help identify patients with more aggressive colorectal cancer", INTERNATIONAL JOUNAL OF ONCOLOGY, (2009), vol. 34, pages 821 - 828, XP002739361 [X] 10 * abstract, page 822, right-hand column, last paragraph * [A] 1-9,12,13 [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/IJO_00000208 | [XAI] - ATSUSHI KANNO ET AL, "Periostin, secreted from stromal cells, has biphasic effect in cell migration and correlates with the epithelial to mesenchymal transition of human pancreatic cells", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, vol. 122, no. 12, doi:10.1002/IJC.23332, ISSN 0020-7136, (20080601), pages 2707 - 2718, (20080401), XP008135286 [X] 10 * abstract, page 2711 * [A] 1-9,12,13 [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.23332 | [XAI] - E.D. GORDON, ET AL, "A protective role for periostin and TGF-beta in IgE-mediated allergy and airway hyperresponsiveness", CLINICAL & EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (20110822), vol. 42, pages 144 - 155, XP009164754 [X] 10 * the whole document, especially the abstract, page 146, left-hand column, 1st full paragraph. * [A] 1-9,12,13 [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2222.2011.03840.x | [A] - STEVEN MARC DAINES ET AL, "Periostin and osteopontin are overexpressed in chronically inflamed sinuses", INTERNATIONAL FORUM OF ALLERGY & RHINOLOGY, (20110301), vol. 1, no. 2, doi:10.1002/alr.20031, ISSN 2042-6976, pages 101 - 105, XP055188223 [A] 1-13 * the whole document, especially the abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/alr.20031 | [A] - EUGENE B KERN ET AL, "Diagnosis and treatment of chronic rhinosinusitis: focus on intranasal Amphotericin B", THERAPEUTICS AND CLINICAL RISK MANAGEMENT, (20070401), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.2147/tcrm.2007.3.2.319, ISSN 1176-6336, pages 319 - 325, XP055188229 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/tcrm.2007.3.2.319 | International search | [A]JP2005500059 (DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC.); | [X]WO2009092052 (MASSACHUSETTS EYE & EAR INFIRM [US], et al); | [X] - AKIHIRO ISHIDA, "Hana Shikkan ni Okeru pendrin Oyobi periostin no Hatsugen ni Tsuite no Kento", NIPPON JIBIINKOKA GAKKAI KAIHO, (2010), vol. 113, no. 4, page 404, XP008173492 | [X] - KONSTANTINA M. STANKOVIC, "Gene Expression Profiling of Nasal Polyps Associated With Chronic Sinusitis and Aspirin-Sensitive Asthma", THE LARYNGOSCOPE, (2008), vol. 118, pages 881 - 889, XP009113976 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MLG.0b013e31816b4b6f | by applicant | WO02052006 | WO2006123677 | WO2009148184 | JP2010096748 | JP2010145294 | - AKIHIRO ISHIDA ET AL., NIPPON JIBIINKOKA GAKKAI KAIHO, (20100420), vol. 113, page 404 | - KRAMER ET AL., LARYNGOSCOPE, (2000), vol. 110, pages 1056 - 1062 | - SHOJI MATSUNE ET AL., JIBI MENEKI ALLERGY, (1999), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 12 - 16 | - G. TAKAYAMA ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 118, pages 98 - 104 | - OSAMU SHIONO ET AL., JIBIINKOKA MENEKI ALLERGY, (2009), vol. 27, no. 2 | - AKIHIRO ISHIDA ET AL., ALLERGY, (20090930), vol. 58, no. 8-9, page 1219 | - OSAMU SHIONO ET AL., PROGRAMS/ABSTRACTS OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF IMMUNOLOGY & ALLERGOLOGY IN OTOLARYNGOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, page 80 | - OSAMU SHIONO ET AL., JIBIINKOKA MENEKI ALLERGY, (2008), vol. 26, no. 2 | - OSAMU SHIONO ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE JAPANESE RHINOLOGIC SOCIETY, (20080831), vol. 47, no. 3, page 235 | - OSAMU SHIONO ET AL., PROGRAMS/ABSTRACTS OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF IMMUNOLOGY & ALLERGOLOGY IN OTOLARYNGOLOGY, (2008), vol. 26, page 74 | - HORIUCHI K; AMIZUKA N; TAKESHITA S; TAKAMATSU H; KATSUURA M; OZAWA H; TOYAMA Y; BONEWALD LF; KUDO A., "Identification and characterization of a novel protein, periostin, with restricted expression to periosteum and periodontal ligament and increased expression by transforming growth factor beta", J BONE MINER RES., (199907), vol. 14, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1359/jbmr.1999.14.7.1239, pages 1239 - 49, XP003015313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/jbmr.1999.14.7.1239 | - AKOBENG, AK. ET AL., ACTA PAEDIATRICA, (2007), vol. 96, pages 644 - 647 | - MILSTEIN C ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, no. 5934, pages 537 - 40 | - JOURNAL OF ALLERGY CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 118, pages 98 - 104 | - HIDEO EBARA, MEDICINE, (1944), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 288 - 290 |