EP2774558 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING VISIBLE PUNCTURE OUTFIT FOR DISPOSABLE LAPAROSCOPE AND PUNCTURE OUTFIT USING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dongguan Microview Medical Technology Co. Ltd Galaxy Industrial Area Qingxi Dongguan Guangdong 523000 / CN | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Zhenquan Galaxy Industrial Area Qingxi Dongguan Guangdong 523000 / CN | 02 /
GOU, Chengjun Galaxy Industrial Area Qingxi Dongguan Guangdong 523000 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Zhitan Galaxy Industrial Area Qingxi Dongguan Guangdong 523000 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Zhenning Galaxy Industrial Area Qingxi Dongguan Guangdong 523000 / CN | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12845699.3 | 14.08.2012 | WO2012CN80092 | Priority number, date | CN20111338794 | 01.11.2011 Original published format: CN201110338794 | [2014/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013063968 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774558 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, // A61B17/94 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/3417 (EP,US);
A61B1/00087 (US);
A61B1/0011 (US);
A61B1/018 (US);
A61B1/05 (US);
A61B17/3478 (US);
A61B17/3496 (EP,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00907 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | A61B17/34, A61B17/94 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SICHTBAREN PUNKTIONSAUSRÜSTUNG FÜR EIN EINWEGLAPAROSKOP UND PUNKTIONSAUSRÜSTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2014/37] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING VISIBLE PUNCTURE OUTFIT FOR DISPOSABLE LAPAROSCOPE AND PUNCTURE OUTFIT USING THE METHOD | [2014/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN OUTIL DE PERFORATION VISIBLE POUR LAPAROSCOPE JETABLE ET OUTIL DE PERFORATION UTILISANT LE PROCÉDÉ | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | Translation filed | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 01.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 12.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 01.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2016 | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4254762 (YOON INBAE) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-6 ** column 3, line 41 - column 6, line 23 *; | [XI]DE29703005U (RIEK SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 6 * figures 1-6 * * abstract * [I] 1-5,7-10; | [XI]WO2005032348 (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US], et al) [X] 6 * figures 14, 15 * * page 16, line 3 - page 20, line 8 * [I] 1-5,7-10; | [XI]EP1977705 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [X] 6 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * [I] 1-5,7-10; | [XI]WO2009021066 (LIGHTHOUSE IMAGING CORP [US], et al) [X] 6 * the whole document * [I] 1-5,7-10 | International search | [A]WO2007035937 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al); | [A]CN2912540Y (FEMTO TECHNOLOGY XI AN CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101069633 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [A]WO2009012547 (TRILHA MARCIAL JR [BR]); | [A]US2010081875 (FOWLER DENNIS [US], et al); | [A]CN201987631U (SHUFEN SUN); | [XP]CN102499737 (MICROVIEW MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [E]CN202376191U (MICROVIEW MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |