EP2775627 - SPECTACLE-TYPE WIRELESS COMMUNICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAYAMA, Tomofumi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12846725.5 | 18.10.2012 | WO2012JP76950 | Priority number, date | JP20110242836 | 04.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011242836 | [2014/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013065496 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775627 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/08, G02C11/00, H01Q1/44, H01Q1/52, H04N5/64, H01Q1/27, H04B1/3827, H04N21/41, H04N21/4363 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H04B1/385 (EP,US);
G02C11/10 (EP,US);
H01Q1/273 (EP,US);
H01Q1/44 (EP,US);
H04N5/64 (EP,US);
H04B2001/3866 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | H04B1/08, G02C11/00, H01Q1/44, H01Q1/52, H04N5/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSER KOMMUNIKATOR IN BRILLENFORM | [2014/37] | English: | SPECTACLE-TYPE WIRELESS COMMUNICATOR | [2014/37] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL DE TYPE LUNETTES | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | Translation filed | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 28.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]JP2002214545 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [ID] 1-6 * abstract *; | [I]DE10118597 (PLANET ID GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2009157605 (SON JIN YOUNG [KR]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6010216 (JESIEK DANIEL STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009076009 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2004320597 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2006139199 (YAMAUCHI MATEX CORP); | [A]JPH11353444 (TERUYA KK); | [A]JP2002247484 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]WO2010109771 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2002214545 |