EP2777549 - CLAMPING AND LIGATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhu, Jian Room 213A Yin Yan Building No.25-27 Yanling Road Tianhe Guangzhou, Guangdong 510600 / CN | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Pereira Toña, Maria Irache Accions en Patents I Marques Padulles, S.L. C/Enric Granados, 21, Pral, 1a 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 12848685.9 | 30.08.2012 | WO2012CN80793 | Priority number, date | CN20111358591 | 11.11.2011 Original published format: CN201110358591 | [2014/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013067844 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2777549 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/122, A61B17/128, A61B17/29 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/122 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/068 (KR);
A61B17/1227 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/128 (CN,KR,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2905 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/38] | A61B17/122, A61B17/128 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | KLEMM- UND VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/38] | English: | CLAMPING AND LIGATING DEVICE | [2014/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CLAMPAGE ET DE LIGATURE | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2014 | Translation filed | 05.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 14.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10011292 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 36 - column 7, line 52 ** figures 1-3, 7 *; | [A]US2002177861 (SUGIYAMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph 85 - page 4, paragraph 106 * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2005080440 (DURGIN RUSSELL F [US], et al) [A] 1-9,19-21 * page 2, paragraph 52 - page 4, paragraph 66 * * page 6, paragraph 80 * * figures 1-5, 8-11, 18 * | International search | [A]CN101087564 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]); | [A]US2008306491 (COHEN ADAM L [US], et al); | [A]WO2011022246 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al); | [A]CN102065780 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC); | [A]CN102090910 (JUNFENG BAI); | [A]WO2011078519 (NAT CANCER CT [KR], et al); | [A]CN102204838 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | by applicant | WO03030746 | CN20058044431 |