EP2782330 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGING DEVICE, AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Yasunori c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA 3 chemin de l'Echo 1213 Onex Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 12849347.5 | 13.11.2012 | WO2012JP07271 | Priority number, date | JP20110251943 | 17.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011251943 | [2014/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013073168 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782330 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, G06T7/20 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/136 (EP,US);
G06T7/248 (EP,US);
H04N23/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/39] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGING DEVICE, AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2014/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2013 | Translation filed | 10.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 18.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.12.2017 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009010549 (MURAMATSU KEIKO [JP]) [X] 1-11* figures 1,2,8,10 * | International search | [A]JPH08167028 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009141475 (NIKON CORP); | [Y]JP2010067252 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2011134117 (CANON KK) |