EP2782085 - ONBOARD ENVIRONMENT-RECOGNITION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEMURA Masayuki c/o Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
MURAMATSU Shoji c/o CLARION CO. LTD. 7-2 Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0081 / JP | 03 /
SHIMA Takeshi c/o Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
SAKATA Masao c/o CLARION CO. LTD. 7-2 Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0081 / JP | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12849641.1 | 05.10.2012 | WO2012JP75886 | Priority number, date | JP20110249816 | 15.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011249816 | [2014/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013073310 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782085 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60R21/00 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
B60W50/06 (EP,US);
G08G1/16 (KR);
H04N7/183 (US);
B60R21/00 (KR);
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
B62D15/029 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGINTERNE UMGEBUNGSERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/39] | English: | ONBOARD ENVIRONMENT-RECOGNITION DEVICE | [2014/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE D'ENVIRONNEMENT EMBARQUÉ | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2014 | Translation filed | 16.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 11.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2006185045 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [X]JP2009116539 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [X]WO2010038851 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011100338 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) | by applicant | WO2008062512 |