EP2783275 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Chala LG Electronics Inc. HE Group 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-713 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Hyejin LG Electronics Inc. HE Group 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-713 / KR | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12852225.7 | 23.11.2012 | WO2012KR09974 | Priority number, date | KR20110124237 | 25.11.2011 Original published format: KR 20110124237 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013077667 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2783275 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F1/16, // G06F3/01 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F1/1692 (EP,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0412 (KR);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/04847 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F2203/0339 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | G06F3/048, G06F3/01, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2014/40] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2014/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006290685 (NAGAKUBO HIDEAKI [JP]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2011057957 (KASAHARA SHUNICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] ** figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2011165913 (LEE SUNJUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0124] * * figures 1,4-7 * [Y] 10 [I] 2-9,11,13-15 | International search | [Y]KR20080068781 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20100027660 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20100003385U (KOREA HOSIDEN ELECTRONICS, CO,. LTD.) | by applicant | US2006290685 | US2011057957 | US2011165913 |