EP2785352 - STABLE INJECTABLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2-HYDROXYPROPYL-BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN AND ALFAXALONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/41] | METHODS OF PRESERVING INJECTABLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A CYCLODEXTRIN AND A HYDROPHOBIC DRUG | ||
[2019/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jurox Pty Ltd 85 Gardiner Street Rutherford, NSW 2320 / AU | [2020/10] |
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states Jurox Pty. Ltd. 85 Gardiners Road Rutherford, NSW 2320 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASLOSKE, Kirby Shawn 18 Cascade Close Louth Park, New South Wales 2320 / AU | 02 /
LAU, Kai 6 Pykett Place Dural, New South Wales 2158 / AU | 03 /
RICHARDSON, Sarah Jane 97 Teralba Road Adamstown, New South Wales 2289 / AU | 04 /
WILLIS, Amanda Aileen 3 Berwick Crescent Maryland, New South Wales 2287 / AU | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2014/41] | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12853138.1 | 27.11.2012 | [2020/11] | WO2012AU01452 | Priority number, date | AU20110904970 | 29.11.2011 Original published format: AU 2011904970 | AU20120904962 | 09.11.2012 Original published format: AU 2012904962 | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013078500 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2785352 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2785352 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/57, A61K47/50, C08L5/16, A61P25/04, A61P29/00, A61P23/00, A61P43/00 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
C08L5/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/40 (KR,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/573 (KR,US);
A61K31/14 (KR,US);
A61K31/403 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/5415 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/702 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (KR,US);
A61K47/10 (KR,US);
A61K47/6951 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (KR,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61P23/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | A61K31/702, A61K47/48, C08L5/16 | ||
Former IPC [2014/41] | A61K31/702, C08L5/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILE INJIZIERBARE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND 2-HYDROXYPROPYL-BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN UND ALFAXALON | [2019/36] | English: | STABLE INJECTABLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2-HYDROXYPROPYL-BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN AND ALFAXALONE | [2019/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES INJECTABLES STABLES COMPRENANT DE LA 2-HYDROXYPROPYL-BETA-CYCLODEXTRINE ET DE L'ALFAXALONE | [2019/36] |
Former [2014/41] | VERFAHREN ZUR KONSERVIERUNG INJIZIERBARER PHARMAZEUTISCHER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM CYCLODEXTRIN UND EINEM HYDROPHOBEN WIRKSTOFF | ||
Former [2014/41] | METHODS OF PRESERVING INJECTABLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A CYCLODEXTRIN AND A HYDROPHOBIC DRUG | ||
Former [2014/41] | PROCÉDÉS DE CONSERVATION DE COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES INJECTABLES COMPRENANT UNE CYCLODEXTRINE ET UN MÉDICAMENT HYDROPHOBE | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 25.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18198778.5 / EP3446692 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2012 | AL | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | LU | 27.11.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 27.11.2012 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.11.2012 | |
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | LV | 11.03.2020 | |
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | LV | 11.03.2020 | |
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | LV | 11.03.2020 | |
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | LV | 11.03.2020 | |
RS | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0605203 (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP]); | [XI]WO9632135 (FARMARC NEDERLAND BV OF CITCO [NL], et al); | [XI]WO9710805 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al); | [XDI]WO2005082416 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al); | International search | [X]WO0197796 (BHARAT SERUMS & VACCINES LTD [IN], et al); | [A]US2007155697 (ADAMI ROGER C [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0605203 | WO9632135 | WO9710805 | WO0170234 | US6358935 | US6723353 | WO2005082416 |