EP2785996 - CROSSOVER VALVE IN DOUBLE PISTON CYCLE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tour Engine, Inc. 6340 Raydel Ct. San Diego, CA 92120 / US | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUR, Hugo, Benjamin c/o Tour Engine Inc. 6340 Raydel Court San Diego, California 32120 / US | 02 /
TOUR, Oded 6340 Raydel Court San Diego, CA 92120 / US | 03 /
TOUR, Gilad c/o Tour Engine Inc. 6340 Raydel Court San Diego, California 32120 / US | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/41] | 01 /
TOUR, Hugo, Benjamin 6340 Raydel Court Kirat Gat / IL | ||
02 /
TOUR, Oded 6340 Raydel Court San Diego, CA 92120 / US | |||
03 /
TOUR, Gilad 6340 Raydel Court Kiryat Gat / IL | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2014/41] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12854161.2 | 30.11.2012 | [2018/42] | WO2012US67477 | Priority number, date | US201161565286P | 30.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161565286 P | US201261714039P | 15.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261714039 P | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013082553 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2785996 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2785996 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02B33/22, F16K21/04, F02B19/18 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
F02B33/30 (EP,US);
F02B33/18 (EP,US);
F02B33/22 (EP,US);
F02B19/02 (EP,US);
F02B19/18 (EP,US);
F02B2710/036 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMSCHALTVENTIL BEI EINEM DOPPELKOLBENTAKTMOTOR | [2014/41] | English: | CROSSOVER VALVE IN DOUBLE PISTON CYCLE ENGINE | [2014/41] | French: | SOUPAPE DE CROISEMENT DANS UN MOTEUR À CYCLE À DEUX PISTONS OPPOSÉS | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 29.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18200785.6 / EP3473829 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2012 | AL | 17.10.2018 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | IE | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | LU | 30.11.2018 | MT | 30.11.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
MT | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
MT | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
MT | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1076846 (SLICK EDWIN E [US]) [Y] 1,3-13 * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]DE428159 (HERMANN DIEK) [Y] 1,3-13 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2182430 (GERSMAN HARVEY M) [Y] 1,3-13 * figures 10-12 *; | [A]US3826086 (MILISAVLJEVIC M) [A] 1 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US4739615 (STAHELI ARTHUR A [US]) [A] 1 * figure 12 *; | [Y]WO9621804 (KIM JUNG KYU [KR]) [Y] 1,3-13 * figure 4 *; | [A]WO9947804 (TECAT ENGINEERING INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6199369 (MEYER DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2413361 (MAIDMENT LESLIE [GB]) [Y] 1,3-13 * figure 6 *; | [A]WO2006113635 (TOUR BENJAMIN H [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0083] , [0085]; figures 22,24 * | International search | [A]US7383797 (TOUR BENJAMIN H [US]); | [Y]US7458350 (DIGGS MATTHEW [US]); | [Y]US7516723 (TOUR BENJAMIN H [US]); | [Y]US2010236534 (SCUDERI STEPHEN P [US], et al); | [Y]US8051811 (PHILLIPS FORD A [US]) | by applicant | US1076846 | DE428159 | US2182430 | WO9621804 | GB2413361 |