EP2793945 - ANTIBODIES USEFUL IN PASSIVE INFLUENZA IMMUNIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trellis Bioscience, LLC 845 Oak Grove Ave, Suite 202 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2018/26] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Trellis Bioscience, LLC 1505-B O'Brien Dr. Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Trellis Bioscience, LLC 2-B Corporate Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUVAR, Lawrence M. 1438 Green Street 7A San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 02 /
ELLSWORTH, Stote 140 Seaview Court No 1401N Marco Island, FL 34145 / US | 03 /
MCCUTCHEON, Krista, Maureen 1512 Carol Avenue Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 04 /
PARK, Minha 275 Mendocino Street Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | 05 /
USINGER, William (Deceased) (Deceased) / US | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
KAUVAR, Lawrence M. 1438 Green Street 7A San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | ||
02 /
ELLSWORTH, Stote 578 Lowell Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | |||
03 /
MCCUTCHEON, Krista, Maureen 1512 Carol Avenue Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | |||
04 /
PARK, Minha 275 Mendocino Street Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | |||
05 /
USINGER, William (Deceased) (Deceased) / US | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/33] |
Former [2014/44] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12854682.7 | 05.12.2012 | [2018/33] | WO2012US68037 | Priority number, date | US201161567046P | 05.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161567046 P | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013086052 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2793945 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2793945 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/10 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
C07K16/1018 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/42 (RU);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | A61K39/42, C40B30/04, A61K38/04, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER ZUR PASSIVEN INFLUENZA-IMMUNISIERUNG | [2014/44] | English: | ANTIBODIES USEFUL IN PASSIVE INFLUENZA IMMUNIZATION | [2014/44] | French: | ANTICORPS UTILES DANS L'IMMUNISATION PASSIVE CONTRE LA GRIPPE | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 26.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.02.2018 | 05.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2012 | AL | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | PT | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IE | 05.12.2018 | LU | 05.12.2018 | MT | 05.12.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.12.2018 | ||
LU | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010130636 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL], et al); | International search | [Y]US4625015 (GREEN NICOLA [US], et al); | [A]US2009203538 (SUGIOKA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2009311183 (DEVY LAETITIA [US], et al); | [A]WO2010027818 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2010086555 (LANZAVECCHIA ANTONIO [CH]); | [A]WO2011126370 (UNIV UTRECHT HOLDING BV [NL], et al); | [AP]WO2011160083 (TRELLIS BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2004080403 | US7413868 | WO2011160083 |