EP2790428 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE SECURE TRANSMISSION OF DATA OVER Z CHANNELS USING CDMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instituto Tecnológico de Buenos Aires Av. Eduardo Madero 399 C1106acd Buenos Aires / AR | [2015/36] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states Instituto Tecnológico de Buenos Aires Av. Eduardo Madero 399 C1106acd Buenos Aires / AR | ||
For all designated states Martínez Buitrago, Jenyfeer A. Cra. 5 No. 34-03 Bogotá / CO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ HAMELIN, Jóse, Ignacio Saraza 1714 - C17141FH Ciudad Autónoma de Buenos Aires / AR | 02 /
BETTACHINI, Victor, Alexis Conesa 986 4aH C1426aqt Buenos Aires / AR | 03 /
ORTEGA, Alfredo Borges 2333 7aB C1425ffg Buenos Aires / AR | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12856337.6 | 05.12.2012 | WO2012IB57003 | Priority number, date | AR2011P104539 | 05.12.2011 Original published format: AR P110104539 | [2014/42] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013084172 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | ES | [2013/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2790428 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/00 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L9/0668 (EP);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W12/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN ÜBER Z-KANÄLE MITTELS CDMA | [2014/42] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE SECURE TRANSMISSION OF DATA OVER Z CHANNELS USING CDMA | [2014/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION SÉCURISÉE DE DONNÉES SUR DES CANAUX Z PAR ACCÈS MULTIPLE À RÉPARTITION PAR CODES (CDMA) | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2014 | Translation filed | 04.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/33] | 12.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010098245 (FANG RUSSELL [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] *; | [XI] - ORTEGA A ALFREDO ET AL, "Point-to-point and Point-to-multipoint CDMA Access Network with Enhanced Security", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20091229), XP080384692 [X] 1,3-7,14,17-19 * the whole document * [I] 2,8-13,15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/ANIC.2011.ATuB6 | [A] - LEMPEL ABRAHAM ET AL, "Families of Sequences with Optimal Hamming Correlation Properties", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (19740101), vol. IT-20, no. 1, pages 90 - 94, XP002741088 [A] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1974.1055169 | International search | [X]US2010124930 (ANDREWS JEFFREY G [US], et al); | [A]US6671310 (RICHARDS JAMES L [US], et al); | [A]US2009216910 (DUCHESNEAU DAVID D [US]) | [A] - JEAN-YVES LE BOUDEC ET AL., "Concurrent and parallel transmissions are optimal for low data-rate IR-UWB networks. Personal, Indoor and Mobile Radio Communications, 2008. PIMRC 2008.", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2008. PIMRC 2008. IEEE 19TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080915), pages 1 - 6, XP031371799 | by applicant | WO2010060456 | US2009313476 | US2008115036 | US2006129814 | WO2006069536 | US2009049532 | - K. OHHATA; O. HIROTA; M. HONDA; S. AKUTSU; Y. DOI; K. HARASAWA; K. YAMASHITA, "10-GB/s optical transceiver using the Yuen 2000 encryption protocol", J. LIGHTW. TECHNOL., (201009), vol. 28, pages 2714 - 2722 | - Z. WANG; L. XU; J. CHANG; T. WANG; P. R. PRUCNAL, "Secure optical transmission in a point-to-point link with encrypted cdma codes", PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE, (201010), vol. 22, no. 19, pages 1410 - 1412, XP011315879 | - A. ORTEGA; V. BETTACHINI; J.I. ALVAREZ-HAMELIN; D. GROSZ, "Point-to-Point and Point-to-multipoint CDMA Access Network with Enhanced Security", ARXIV:0912.5324V3, (20110203), URL: http:llarxiv.orglabs10912.5324v3 | - "The self-shrinking generator", W. MEIER; 0. STAFFELBACH, Advances in Cryptology-EUROCRYPT'94, A. De Santis, SPRINGER, (1994), pages 205 - 214 |