EP2788726 - MULTIPHASE FLOWMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89m 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:BE
EE
ES
FI
IS
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
RS
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | [2019/41] |
Former [2014/42] | For:AL
AT
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89m 2514 JG The Hague / NL | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola 1110 / VG | |||
For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
For:BE
EE
ES
FI
IS
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
RS
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Cheng-gang Schlumberger Gould Research High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2019/41] |
Former [2014/42] | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12856370.7 | 06.12.2012 | [2019/41] | WO2012IB57024 | Priority number, date | US201161567220P | 06.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161567220 P | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013084183 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2788726 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2788726 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66, // G01F1/74, G01F1/44, G01F1/36, G01F1/50, G01F1/58 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
G01F1/363 (EP,US);
G01F1/58 (US);
G01F1/44 (EP,US);
G01F1/50 (EP,US);
G01F1/662 (US);
G01F1/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/42] | G01F1/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPHASEN-DURCHFLUSSMESSER | [2014/42] | English: | MULTIPHASE FLOWMETER | [2014/42] | French: | DÉBITMÈTRE MULTIPHASE | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 14.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2012 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | IE | 06.12.2019 | LU | 06.12.2019 | FR | 09.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | DE | 01.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.12.2019 | ||
LU | 06.12.2019 | ||
FR | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.12.2019 | ||
LU | 06.12.2019 | ||
FR | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.12.2019 | ||
LU | 06.12.2019 | ||
FR | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.12.2019 | ||
LU | 06.12.2019 | ||
FR | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.12.2019 | ||
LU | 06.12.2019 | ||
FR | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.12.2019 | ||
LU | 06.12.2019 | ||
FR | 09.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.12.2019 | ||
LU | 06.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1009975 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY BV [NL], et al) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] *; | [X]WO0045133 (ASPELUND AUDUN [NO], et al) [X] 12 * figures 5-6 *; | [XA]GB2430493 (SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS [VG]) [X] 12,13,15 * figures 1B, 2 * * claim 4 * * page 19, line 26 - line 32 * * page 30, line 21 - line 25 * [A] 7,8,11; | [X]WO2007129897 (MULTI PHASE METERS AS [NO], et al) [X] 12 * figure 5 * * step 7; page 13 *; | [A] - YI LI ET AL, "Measurement of multi-phase distribution using an integrated dual-modality sensor", IMAGING SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES, 2009. IST '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090511), ISBN 978-1-4244-3482-4, pages 335 - 339, XP031472943 [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 4, 10 * * III B. Imaging gas-oil-water three-component flow * | International search | [A]US2001050881 (DEPAOLI DAVID W [US], et al); | [A]US6655221 (ASPELUND AUDUN [NO], et al); | [A]WO2008046805 (PIETRO FIORENTINI SPA [IT], et al); | [A]US2009126502 (WEE ARNSTEIN [NO], et al); | [X]US2011267074 (XIE CHENG-GANG [GB], et al) | Examination | GB2376074 | US2011267074 | - Cheng-Gang Xie, "Measurement Of Multiphase Flow Water Fraction And Water-cut", AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, NEW YORK, US, (20070101), vol. 914, doi:10.1063/1.2747436, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 232 - 239, XP055427281 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2747436 | - WUQIANG YANG ET AL, "Multiphase flow measurement by electrical capacitance tomography", IMAGING SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES (IST), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110517), doi:10.1109/IST.2011.5962201, ISBN 978-1-61284-894-5, pages 108 - 111, XP031907200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IST.2011.5962201 |