EP2790725 - METHODS FOR IMPROVING MEDICAL THERAPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buck Institute For Research On Aging 8001 Redwood Boulevard Novato, California 94945 / US | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPISI, Judith 1 Roble Road Berkeley California 94705 / US | 02 /
DEMARIA, Marco 7100 Geary Road San Francisco California 94121 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Salisbury, Frances, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Salisbury, Frances, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12856743.5 | 13.12.2012 | WO2012US69601 | Priority number, date | US201161570166P | 13.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161570166 P | US201261692680P | 23.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261692680 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013090645 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790725 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K48/00, A61P35/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K38/085 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K39/21 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
G01N33/5011 (US);
G01N33/502 (US);
G01N33/5023 (US);
G01N33/5044 (US);
A01K2217/052 (EP,US);
A01K2217/30 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0331 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0393 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1089 (US);
G01N2500/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | 08.07.2014 | ME | 08.07.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG MEDIZINISCHER THERAPIEN | [2014/43] | English: | METHODS FOR IMPROVING MEDICAL THERAPIES | [2014/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'AMÉLIORATION DE THÉRAPIES MÉDICALES | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 29.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/29] | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2016 | 31.12.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009085216 (SQUICOR [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* whole document esp. claims 25 and 45 *; | [Y]JP2009161494 (NOEVIR KK) [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. paragraphs [2,8] and abstract *; | [Y] - GORGOULIS V G ET AL, "Oncogene-induced senescence: the bright and dark side of the response", CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0955-0674, (20101201), pages 816 - 827, (20101201), XP027542642 [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. Table 2/ pages 821, 822 * | [Y] - A. V. ORJALO ET AL, "Cell surface-bound IL-1 is an upstream regulator of the senescence-associated IL-6/IL-8 cytokine network", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20091006), vol. 106, no. 40, doi:10.1073/pnas.0905299106, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 17031 - 17036, XP055206000 [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. ... * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0905299106 | International search | [X]WO2006018632 (UNIV NEWCASTLE [GB], et al); | [A]US2009202654 (NIXON ANDREW J [US]); | [A]US2011027806 (GORDON LESLIE B [US], et al); | [A]US2011300112 (MARBAN EDUARDO [US], et al); | [A] - CHISTIAKOV, D. A., "How to fight with senescent cells?", GERIATRICS & GERONTOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (20110317), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 233 - 235, XP055156323 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1447-0594.2010.00654.x |