EP2790772 - COMPLIANT, REINFORCED ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/43] | COMPLIANT, REINFORCED ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | ||
[2020/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Med-El Elektromedizinische Geraete GmbH Fuerstenweg 77 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2020/31] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Med-El Elektromedizinische Geraete GmbH Fuerstenweg 77 6020 Innsbruck / AT | ||
For all designated states Wilson, Willard Two Carlson Parkway N. Suite 155 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447 / US | |||
For all designated states Cross, Tom Two Carlson Parkway N. Suite 155 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447 / US | |||
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Neurostream Technologies G.P. 4780 rue Saint-Felix Suite 105 Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures Québec G3A 2J9 / CA | ||
For all designated states Wilson, Willard Two Carlson Parkway N. Suite 155 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447 / US | |||
For all designated states Cross, Tom Two Carlson Parkway N. Suite 155 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Willard Two Carlson Parkway N. Suite 155 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447 / US | 02 /
CROSS, Tom Two Carlson Parkway N. Suite 155 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2021/08] |
Former [2014/43] | Wallis, Naomi Rachel, et al Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar BS27 3AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 12856771.6 | 20.11.2012 | [2021/08] | WO2012US66040 | Priority number, date | US201161569563P | 12.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161569563 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013089988 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790772 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2790772 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61N1/0556 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (EP);
A61B5/388 (US);
A61B5/4094 (EP,US);
A61B5/6877 (EP,US);
A61B2562/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHGIEBIGE, VERSTÄRKTE ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG | [2020/01] | English: | COMPLIANT, REINFORCED ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY | [2021/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE DÉFORMABLE RENFORCÉ | [2020/01] |
Former [2014/43] | NACHGIEBIGE, VERSTÄRKTE ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2014/43] | COMPLIANT, REINFORCED ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | ||
Former [2014/43] | ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE DÉFORMABLE RENFORCÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 04.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2012 | AL | 24.02.2021 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | MT | 24.02.2021 | NL | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | TR | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | IE | 20.11.2021 | LU | 20.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.11.2012 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
TR | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.11.2012 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 20.11.2012 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5265608 (LEE PHILIP [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-17 * column 2, line 22 - line 4 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5487756 (KALLESOE KLAUS [CA], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 14 ** figure 1 *; | [X]WO9956922 (CHASE WALTON ELASTOMERS INC [US]) [X] 10,11,18,19 * page 1, line 18 - line 29 * * page 2, line 3 - line 33 * * page 5, line 5 - page 17 *; | [X]US6600956 (MASCHINO STEVE E [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-17 * column 4, line 2 - line 52 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 65 * * figure 1A *; | [X]US2007185542 (BOLEA STEPHEN L [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-17 * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0141] * * figures 6-11,19 *; | [X]US2007213579 (HEGDE ANANT V [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-17 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0165] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0176] * * figures 12,14A,14C *; | [X]US2008103407 (BOLEA STEPHEN L [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-17 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0077] *; | [X]US2011143617 (DE LA VEGA II DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 10,11,18,19 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * figures 1,8 *; | [X]US2011147046 (BONDE ERIC H [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,12-17 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 2-5 * | International search | [X]US6600956 (MASCHINO STEVE E [US], et al); | [A]US2008103407 (BOLEA STEPHEN L [US], et al); | [X]US2010312320 (FALTYS MICHAEL A [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9956922 | US6600956 | US2007185543 | US2007213579 | US2008103407 | US2011147046 | US8214056 |