EP2793014 - OBJECT SURFACE HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCE DETECTION APPARATUS AND DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Fl., Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Weizhi 2nd Floor Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu, Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 02 /
YU, Haijun 2nd Floor Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu, Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Yangtian 2nd Floor Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu, Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Loock, Jan Pieter Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12856801.1 | 12.12.2012 | WO2012CN01689 | Priority number, date | CN201110423036 | 16.12.2011 Original published format: CN201110423036 | [2014/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013086783 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2793014 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/02, G01N33/22 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
G01N1/02 (EP,US);
G01N15/0606 (US);
G01N2001/022 (EP,US);
G01N2001/024 (EP,US);
G01N2001/028 (EP,US);
G01N2015/0003 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON GEFAHRSTOFFEN AUF EINER OBJEKTOBERFLÄCHE UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN | [2014/43] | English: | OBJECT SURFACE HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCE DETECTION APPARATUS AND DETECTION METHOD | [2014/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE SUBSTANCES DANGEREUSES EN SURFACE D'OBJET | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2014 | Translation filed | 16.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 12.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0905501 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7-9,13-15 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0087] * * figure 7 * * figure 8 * [A] 3,10 [I] 5,6,11,12; | [XI]US2009248319 (CALL CHARLES JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,10 * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0104] * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * figure 8 * * figure 9 * * figure 11 *[I] 5,6,11,12; | [A]GB2473980 (NUCTECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2004114130 (NGUYEN DAO HINH [CA], et al); | [X]US2005274205 (SLEEMAN RICHARD [GB], et al); | [A]US2006226358 (ISHIKAWA MASAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2007002037 (O'DONNELL DAN [US], et al); | [A]US2007189922 (ECKELS JOEL D [US], et al); | [Y]US2008264186 (NACSON SABATINO [CA], et al); | [X]US2009161824 (JENKINS ANTHONY [US]); | [X]US2009248319 (CALL CHARLES JOHN [US], et al); | [X]WO2010011384 (L3 COMMUNICATIONS CYTERRA CORP [US], et al); | [A]CN102109434 (NUCTECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102116709 (DALIAN CHEMICAL PHYSICS INST); | [A]CN102147340 (NUCTECH CO LTD); | [XP]CN202453338U (NUCTECH CO LTD) |