EP2790968 - PROVIDING A USER INTERFACE EXPERIENCE BASED ON INFERRED VEHICLE STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/22] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAEK, Timothy S. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
BAHL, Paramvir c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ADDAGATLA, Sreenivas c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Holtby, Christopher Lawrence, et al Olswang Germany LLP Promenadeplatz 12 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12857653.5 | 07.12.2012 | WO2012US68325 | Priority number, date | US201113327786 | 16.12.2011 Original published format: US201113327786 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013090125 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790968 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/102, B60W50/10, B60W50/08, G06F1/16, G06F3/0481, B60K37/06, B60K35/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
H04W48/04 (US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/20 (EP,US);
B60K35/26 (EP,US);
B60K35/28 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP,US);
B60K35/50 (EP,US);
B60K35/80 (EP,US);
B60K35/85 (EP,US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (EP,US);
B60K2360/146 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1464 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1472 (EP,US);
B60K2360/148 (EP,US);
B60K2360/151 (EP,US);
B60K2360/166 (EP,US);
B60K2360/182 (EP,US);
B60K2360/21 (EP,US);
B60K2360/566 (EP,US);
B60K2360/573 (EP,US);
B60K2360/586 (EP,US);
B60K2360/5894 (EP,US);
B60K2360/5899 (EP,US);
B60K2360/592 (EP,US);
B60K2360/834 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | B60R25/102, B60W50/10, B60W50/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG EINER BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENERFAHRUNG AUF DER BASIS EINES ANGENOMMENEN FAHRZEUGZUSTANDES | [2014/43] | English: | PROVIDING A USER INTERFACE EXPERIENCE BASED ON INFERRED VEHICLE STATE | [2014/43] | French: | PRESTATION D'UNE EXPÉRIENCE D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR BASÉE SUR LA DÉDUCTION DE L'ÉTAT D'UN VÉHICULE | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 14.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 02.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/31] | 16.03.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006205394 (VESTERINEN MATTI I [FI]) [I] 1-5,7,9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0015] - [0025] ** paragraphs [0080] - [0092] - [0098] , [0105] *; | [X]WO2010051455 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 6 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 8 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 16 * * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 30 * * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 27 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 11 * * page 15, lines 19-27 * | International search | [A]WO0100463 (JIMI COMM LTD [IL], et al); | [A]EP2113431 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]); | [A]US7725129 (GRUNHOLD OLIVER DAVID [US]); | [A]KR20100116387 (UNIV CHUNG ANG IND [KR]); | [A]WO2011149709 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY INC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010051455 |