EP2644313 - SOLDER ALLOY FOR ACOUSTIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo, 120-8555 / JP | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAGI, Ippei c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TOKIMOTO, Hideki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Seiki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
SEINO, Masahumi c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 Senju-hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 05 /
OSAWA, Isamu c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 Senju-hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 06 /
UESHIMA, Minoru c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 Senju-hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | [2014/04] |
Former [2013/40] | 01 /
AKAGI Ippei c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TOKIMOTO Hideki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
SUZUKI Seiki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
SEINO Masahumi c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 Senju-hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | |||
05 /
OSAWA Isamu c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 Senju-hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | |||
06 /
UESHIMA Minoru c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 23 Senju-hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/40] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12858684.9 | 10.05.2012 | [2016/10] | WO2012JP62009 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013108421 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2644313 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2644313 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/26, C22C13/00 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B23K35/262 (EP,US);
B23K35/26 (EP,KR,US);
B23K1/06 (KR);
B23K3/04 (KR);
C22C13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖTLEGIERUNG FÜR EINE AKUSTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2013/40] | English: | SOLDER ALLOY FOR ACOUSTIC DEVICE | [2013/40] | French: | ALLIAGE DE BRASAGE POUR DISPOSITIF ACOUSTIQUE | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2013 | Translation filed | 27.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 18.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2012 | AL | 09.03.2016 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | MK | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | RS | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | SM | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | IE | 10.05.2016 | LU | 10.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | GB | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GB | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005103645 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006129713 (SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US2003015575 (YAMAGUCHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-8; tables 1-18 *; | [A]JP2000173253 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001001180 (TANAKA ELECTRONICS IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2003230980 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [AD] 1,2 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH11277290 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2000173253 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2001001180 (TANAKA ELECTRONICS IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2002096191 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2005103645 (HITACHI METALS LTD) | by applicant | JPH11277290 | JP2002239780 | JP2003230980 |