EP2796614 - CLOTHES DRYER AND METHOD OF CLEANING EVAPORATOR IN CLOTHES DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUBAYASHI, Mitsuyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61,Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KAWAI, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61,Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
TAHARA, Mikio c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61,Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
FUJIWARA, Norihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61,Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12859090.8 | 10.12.2012 | WO2012JP07867 | Priority number, date | JP20110278088 | 20.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011278088 | JP20110278094 | 20.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011278094 | [2014/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013094145 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796614 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20, D06F58/24, D06F58/22 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
D06F58/206 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/30 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/22 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/24 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | D06F58/28, D06F58/02, D06F58/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | WÄSCHETROCKNER UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN EINES VERDAMPFERS IN DEM WÄSCHETROCKNER | [2014/44] | English: | CLOTHES DRYER AND METHOD OF CLEANING EVAPORATOR IN CLOTHES DRYER | [2014/44] | French: | SÈCHE-LINGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE D'UN ÉVAPORATEUR DANS UN SÈCHE-LINGE | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2014 | Translation filed | 14.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 17.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4212965 (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2005224491 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,6,9-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006061211 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2008264164 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP2037035 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022]; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE102007052835 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6,9-13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0044] , [0045]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2157231 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0013] *; | [A]EP2199455 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0069]; figures 1,3 * | International search | [Y]JP2001293278 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005224491 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008055077 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |