EP2797339 - EARPHONE AND FABRICATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Yimu ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Xiaoming ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Chas. Hude A/S Langebrogade 3B 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 12859720.0 | 08.03.2012 | WO2012CN72102 | Priority number, date | CN201110432236 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: CN201110432236 | [2014/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013091307 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797339 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H04R1/1033 (EP,US);
H04R31/00 (US);
H04R2201/107 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | KOPFHÖHRER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/44] | English: | EARPHONE AND FABRICATION METHOD THEREOF | [2014/44] | French: | ECOUTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2014 | Translation filed | 21.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 04.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 21.07.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7507908 (WU HSIN-HSIEN [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 30; claims 4,5 * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US2009314515 (BEVIRT JOEBEN [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]JP2003324784 (INAMURA YOSHINORI) [X] 1,4-7,10 * abstract * [Y] 8,9; | [YA]US6600826 (XAVIER ELIUS A [US]) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * [A] 1 | International search | [Y]US6600826 (XAVIER ELIUS A [US]); | [A]CN101449339 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]); | [X]CN101567233 (MERRY ELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]) | Examination | US2007158096 | CN101567233 | GB447471 |