EP2793603 - AUTOMATED METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING OF BLENDED ICE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Delfield Company, LLC 980 South Isabella Road Mt. Pleasant MI 48858 / US | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKER, Darrel, Jay 209 West Deerfield Road West Pleasant, MI 48858 / US | 02 /
BROWN, James, Wallace 7402 Abbott Grove Court Crestwood, KY 40014 / US | 03 /
KRCHMAR, Travis, James 6457 West LilyLake Road Harrison, MI 48625 / US | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12860266.1 | 21.12.2012 | WO2012US71320 | Priority number, date | US201161579431P | 22.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161579431 P | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013096808 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2793603 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/30, B08B9/027 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
A23G9/30 (EP,US);
B08B9/027 (EP,US);
F25C2400/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | A23G9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG EINER MASCHINE FÜR GEMISCHTES SPEISEEIS | [2014/44] | English: | AUTOMATED METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING OF BLENDED ICE MACHINE | [2014/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ AUTOMATISÉS POUR NETTOYAGE DE MACHINE DE GLACE MÉLANGÉE | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0215710 (LANCER FBD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11,14,15 * page 11, line 14 - page 12, line 26 * * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 3 * * figures 11,12A-L * [I] 4,5,8,12,13; | [A]WO9738589 (MESA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 20 - line 28 *; | [A]US5410888 (KAISER LAWRENCE R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 10, line 44 - column 11, line 19 *; | [A]JP2005274020 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US6725675 (KAMPERT MATTHEW E [US], et al); | [Y]US7281386 (MCDOUGAL GREGORY S [US], et al); | [A]US5289691 (SCHLOSSER CHARLES E [US], et al); | [A]US6311501 (ALLISON MATTHEW W [US], et al); | [A]US6619051 (KILAWEE PATICK [US], et al) |