EP2794860 - METHOD FOR INDUCING DIFFERENTIATION OF HUMAN PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS INTO INTERMEDIATE MESODERM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSAFUNE, Kenji c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 02 /
ARAOKA, Toshikazu c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2014/44] | Dempster, Robert Charles D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12860444.4 | 19.12.2012 | [2017/18] | WO2012JP83762 | Priority number, date | US201161577345P | 19.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161577345 P | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013094771 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2794860 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2794860 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N5/073, C12N5/0735, C12N5/0775, C12N15/09 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
C12N5/0686 (EP,US);
C12N5/0605 (US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2501/385 (EP,US);
C12N2501/415 (EP,US);
C12N2501/727 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG DER DIFFERENZIERUNG MENSCHLICHER PLURIPOTENTER STAMMZELLEN IN INTERMEDIÄRE MESODERMZELLEN | [2014/44] | English: | METHOD FOR INDUCING DIFFERENTIATION OF HUMAN PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS INTO INTERMEDIATE MESODERM CELLS | [2014/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDUCTION D'UNE DIFFÉRENTIATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES HUMAINES EN CELLULES DE MÉSODERME INTERMÉDIAIRE | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 29.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2012 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | IE | 19.12.2017 | LU | 19.12.2017 | MT | 19.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SUMI TOMOYUKI ET AL, "Defining early lineage specification of human embryonic stem cells by the orchestrated balance of canonical Wnt/beta-catenin, Activin/Nodal and BMP signaling", DEVELOPMENT, THE COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS LTD, GB, vol. 135, no. 17, ISSN 0950-1991, (20080901), pages 2969 - 2979, (20080730), XP009165629 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.021121 | [A] - H. K. BONE ET AL, "A novel chemically directed route for the generation of definitive endoderm from human embryonic stem cells based on inhibition of GSK-3", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (20110615), vol. 124, no. 12, doi:10.1242/jcs.081679, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 1992 - 2000, XP055157158 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.081679 | [A] - GREGORY R. DRESSLER, "The Cellular Basis of Kidney Development", ANNUAL REVIEW OF CELL AND DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (20061101), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev.cellbio.22.010305.104340, ISSN 1081-0706, pages 509 - 529, XP055184273 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.cellbio.22.010305.104340 | [A] - KIM DOYEOB ET AL, "Nephrogenic factors promote differentiation of mouse embryonic stem cells into renal epithelia", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 16, no. 12, doi:10.1681/ASN.2005050544, ISSN 1046-6673, (20051201), pages 3527 - 3534, (20051102), XP002587898 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2005050544 | [T] - TOSHIKAZU ARAOKA ET AL, "Efficient and Rapid Induction of Human iPSCs/ESCs into Nephrogenic Intermediate Mesoderm Using Small Molecule-Based Differentiation Methods", PLOS ONE, (20140115), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0084881, page e84881, XP055184928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0084881 | International search | [AP]WO2012011610 (UNIV KYOTO [JP], et al); | [A] - MAE,S. ET AL., "Differentiation Induction of Intermediate Mesoderm from Mouse ES Cell Using Low-Molecular Compounds.", THE 420D ANNUAL MEETING OF THE JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL MOLECULAR MORPHOLOGY, (2010), page 44, XP008173127 | [A] - AO,A. ET AL., "Regenerative Chemical Biology: Current Challenges and Future Potential.", CHEM.BIOL., (201104), vol. 18, pages 413 - 424, XP055146549 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2011.03.011 | [A] - XU,Y. ET AL., "A chemical approach to stem-cell biology and regenerative medicine.", NATURE, (2008), vol. 453, pages 338 - 344, XP055013324 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature07042 | [A] - MAE,S. ET AL., "Combination of small molecules enhances differentiation of mouse embryonic stem cells into intermediate mesoderm through BMP7-positive cells.", BIOCHEM.BIOPHYS.RES.COMMUN., (2010), vol. 393, pages 877 - 882, XP026970773 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2010.02.111 | [A] - OSAFUNE K. ET AL., "In vitro regeneration of kidney from pluripotent stem cells.", EXP.CELL RES., (2010), vol. 316, pages 2571 - 2577, XP027264821 | [AP] - OSAFUNE K., "Kidney regeneration and its clinical application using iPS cell technology.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (20111231), vol. 239, no. 14, pages 1379 - 1384, XP008172812 | by applicant | WO2012011610 | - TADA, M. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2001), vol. 11, pages 1553 - 1558 | - COWAN, C. A. ET AL., SCIENCE, (20050826), vol. 309, no. 5739, pages 1369 - 1373 | WO2011JP67181 |