EP2795949 - MOBILE DEVICE SAFE DRIVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/22] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRADER, Joseph A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SARIN, Raman K. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Ted Tai-Yu c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
AGARWAL, Sharad c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
MATTHEWS, III, Joseph H. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
GUDAY, Shai c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
KING, Joseph Spencer c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2018/04] |
Former [2014/44] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12860631.6 | 23.12.2012 | [2018/04] | WO2012US71545 | Priority number, date | US201161580131P | 23.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161580131 P | US201261695294P | 30.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261695294 P | US201213726097 | 22.12.2012 Original published format: US201213726097 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013096943 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2795949 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2795949 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, H04M1/725, H04W8/22, G08G1/0967, H04W4/04, H04W4/02, H04W8/18, H04W12/08 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
G08G1/096725 (US);
H04M1/72412 (US);
H04M1/72457 (US);
H04M1/724631 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/40 (US);
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (US);
B60W2540/22 (EP,US);
H04M1/6091 (EP,US);
H04M1/724634 (EP,US);
H04M2250/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/04] | H04W12/08, H04W88/02, H04W4/02, H04W4/04, H04W8/18 | ||
Former IPC [2014/44] | H04W12/08, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG MIT FAHRSICHERHEITSMODUS | [2014/44] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE SAFE DRIVING | [2014/44] | French: | MODE DE CONDUITE INTÉGRÉ À UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2012 | AL | 24.01.2018 | AT | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | CZ | 24.01.2018 | DK | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | ES | 24.01.2018 | FI | 24.01.2018 | HR | 24.01.2018 | IT | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | LV | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | MK | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | RS | 24.01.2018 | SE | 24.01.2018 | SI | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | SM | 24.01.2018 | TR | 24.01.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | NO | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.12.2012 | |
AL | 24.01.2018 | ||
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009224931 (DIETZ DAVID BLAINE [CA], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0028] * * claim 9 *; | [I]US2010216509 (RIEMER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [I] 1-11* abstract *; | [I]US2011021234 (TIBBITTS SCOTT FERRILL [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * figures 2,5,9 * * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2010216509 (RIEMER MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [Y]US2011169654 (KETARI NISSAF [TN]) | by applicant | US2009224931 | US2010216509 | US2011021234 |