EP2658354 - GOLDEN FINGER AND PLATE EDGE INTERCONNECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/38] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Kai Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Yongfa Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Yingpei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12861057.3 | 26.10.2012 | [2015/38] | WO2012CN83539 | Priority number, date | CN20121017504 | 19.01.2012 Original published format: CN201210017504 | [2013/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013107199 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2658354 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2658354 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/11, H05K1/02, H05K3/40 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
H05K1/117 (EP,US);
H05K1/0265 (EP,US);
H05K1/0298 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0919 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09481 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0979 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | H05K1/11, H05K1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GOLDFINGER- UND BLECHRANDVERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/44] | English: | GOLDEN FINGER AND PLATE EDGE INTERCONNECTION DEVICE | [2013/44] | French: | LAME DE CONNECTEUR DORÉE ET DISPOSITIF D'INTERCONNEXION DE BORD DE PLAQUE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2013 | Translation filed | 04.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 23.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2012 | AL | 16.09.2015 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | IE | 26.10.2015 | LU | 26.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | HR | 16.09.2015 | |
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | HR | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | HR | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003131472 (CHENG YU-CHIANG [TW] ET AL) [A] 4,5 * abstract *; | [A]US2007074901 (TAKIZAWA MINORU [JP]) [A] 6-8 * paragraphs [0101] - [0105]; figures 11, 17 * | International search | [A]US2006032666 (KIM JIN C [KR], et al); | [A]JP2009218287 (NORITAKE CO LTD); | [A]JP2010067668 (NIPPON AVIONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN201967249U (SHENZHEN TONGCHUANGXIN ELECTRONIC CO LTD); | [Y]CN102264194 (PLOTECH TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., KUNSHAN PLANT); | [Y]TWM417743U (HON HAI PREC IND CO LTD [TW]); | [XP]CN102548205 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) | Examination | JPH07312268 |