EP2798537 - KNOWLEDGE-BASED ENTITY DETECTION AND DISAMBIGUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/20] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Kang c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
LI, Yi c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Yiping c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
LV, Zhengdong c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
CAO, Yohn c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12861350.2 | 14.12.2012 | WO2012US69604 | Priority number, date | US201113340722 | 30.12.2011 Original published format: US201113340722 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013101490 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798537 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/20 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/9538 (US);
G06F16/3346 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | WISSENSBASIERTE ENTITÄTSDETEKTION UND -UNTERSCHEIDUNG | [2014/45] | English: | KNOWLEDGE-BASED ENTITY DETECTION AND DISAMBIGUATION | [2014/45] | French: | DÉTECTION ET DÉSAMBIGUÏSATION D'ENTITÉS FONDÉES SUR LES CONNAISSANCES | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 27.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 20.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Anonymous, "Inverted index - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", Internet, (20111101), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20111101221823/http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Inverted_index, (20150623), XP055197702 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2005222977 (ZHOU HONG [US], et al); | [A]US2008306908 (AGRAWAL SANJAY [US], et al); | [A]US2009182725 (GOVANI TABREEZ [US], et al); | [A]US2010235340 (TODHUNTER JAMES [US], et al); | [X]US2011225155 (ROULLAND FREDERIC [FR], et al) | by applicant | US2011225155 |