EP2799311 - STRUCTURE FOR SIDE PORTION OF VEHICLE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAI, Shigeyuki c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
KITAYAMA, Kenichi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Yasunori c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2014/45] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12861841.0 | 13.11.2012 | [2016/30] | WO2012JP79347 | Priority number, date | JP20110289081 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011289081 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013099456 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799311 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799311 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/04, B62D25/06, B62D27/02, B60R13/06 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
B62D25/04 (EP,US);
B60J10/84 (EP,US);
B60R13/06 (EP,US);
B62D25/06 (US);
B62D27/023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | B62D25/04, B60J10/08, B60R13/06, B62D25/06, B62D27/02 | ||
Former IPC [2014/45] | B62D25/04, B60J10/08, B60R13/06, B62D25/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTUR FÜR EIN SEITENTEIL EINES FAHRZEUGKÖRPERS | [2014/45] | English: | STRUCTURE FOR SIDE PORTION OF VEHICLE BODY | [2014/45] | French: | STRUCTURE DESTINÉE À UNE PARTIE LATÉRALE DE CARROSSERIE DE VÉHICULE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2014 | Translation filed | 22.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 29.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2012 | AL | 27.07.2016 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | GB | 13.11.2016 | IE | 13.11.2016 | MT | 13.11.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 13.11.2012 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
MT | 13.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 13.11.2012 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
MT | 13.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.11.2012 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
GB | 13.11.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2690404 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]JPH08108864 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-12 *; | [A]US2006138807 (HASEGAWA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2011233970 (NAGAI SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0066] - [0089]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]JP2011240887 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS4921227B (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [A]JPS60178282U (SUZUKI MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH11227632 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JPH11348821 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2001322506 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2011088494 | JP2011195107 |