EP2800124 - POLISHING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujimi Incorporated 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8502 / JP | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOTA, Shuugo c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8502 / JP | 02 /
KACHI, Yoshihiro c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8502 / JP | 03 /
AKATSUKA, Tomohiko c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8502 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12862165.3 | 25.12.2012 | WO2012JP83472 | Priority number, date | JP20110287264 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011287264 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013099866 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800124 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, B24B37/00, C09K3/14, H01L21/02, H01L31/05 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
C09G1/02 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/31053 (EP,CN,US);
B24B1/00 (US);
B24B37/044 (EP,CN,US);
C09K3/1409 (EP,CN,US);
C09K3/1463 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | H01L21/304, B24B37/00, C09K3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | POLIERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2014/45] | English: | POLISHING COMPOSITION | [2014/45] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLISSAGE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2014 | Translation filed | 23.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007196975 (NOMURA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]JP2011165759 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053] , [0074] , [0033] , [0034] , [0112] , [0114] , [0045] , [0046] , [0078] , [0093] *; | [E]EP2610031 (FUJIMI INC [JP]) [E] 1-5 * paragraphs [0025] , [0029] , [0047] * | International search | [X]JP2004534396 (PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO, INC.); | [Y]JP2009049401 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT); | [Y]JP2010074196 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2011165759 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2007207785 | JP2009152647 | JP2010269985 | - "Sulfonic acid-functionalized silica through quantitative oxidation of thiol groups", CHEM. COMMUN., (2003), pages 246 - 247 | - "Novel Silane Coupling Agents Containing a Photolabile 2-Nitrobenzyl Ester for Introduction of a Carboxy Group on the Surface of Silica Gel", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 3, pages 228 - 229 |