EP2800143 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Takashi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | 02 /
MIYAZAKI, Masayuki c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | 03 /
TAKISHITA, Hiroshi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | 04 /
KURIBAYASHI, Hidenao c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2020/20] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Takashi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAZAKI, Masayuki c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKISHITA, Hiroshi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | |||
04 /
KURIBAYASHI, Hidenao c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | |||
Former [2014/45] | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Takashi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAZAKI, Masayuki c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKISHITA, Hiroshi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | |||
04 /
KURIBAYASHI, Hidenao c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2014/45] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12862913.6 | 28.12.2012 | [2020/15] | WO2012JP84241 | Priority number, date | JP20110287269 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011287269 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013100155 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800143 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2800143 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/861, H01L21/336, H01L29/739, H01L29/78, H01L29/868, H01L29/32, H01L21/265 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H01L29/36 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/263 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/063 (US);
H01L21/26506 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/26513 (US);
H01L21/324 (EP,US);
H01L29/0834 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/1095 (US);
H01L29/32 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/66128 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/7395 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/861 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | H01L29/861, H01L21/336, H01L29/739, H01L29/78, H01L29/868 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2014/45] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2014/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DU DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2014 | Translation filed | 28.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 27.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2012 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | GB | 28.12.2020 | IE | 28.12.2020 | LU | 28.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MK | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2008091853 (FUJI ELEC DEVICE TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * [I] 2,5-7; | [X]JP2008211148 (FUJI ELEC DEVICE TECH CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * example 2 *; | [XI]US2011140243 (MISUMI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 8,14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2, 13-15 * [I] 9-13,15; | [A] - J. N KLUG ET AL, "N-type doping of silicon by proton implantation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2011-14TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS (EPE 2011), (20110830), ISBN 978-1-61-284167-0, pages 1 - 7, XP055189405 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH09232332 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JP2008211148 (FUJI ELEC DEVICE TECH CO LTD); | [A]JP2011049300 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) | by applicant | US2006286753 | WO2007055352 |