EP2762012 - ACTIVE SMALL-MOLECULE DONKEY-HIDE GELATIN MIXTURE AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shan Dong Dong-e E-Jiao Co., Ltd 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng, Shandong 252299 / CN | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIN, Yufeng 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | 02 /
YOU, Jinhua 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Xiangshan 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | 04 /
FANG, Zhe 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Jianling 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | [2017/09] |
Former [2014/32] | 01 /
QIN, Yufeng 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | ||
02 /
YOU, Jinhua 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHOU, Xiangshan 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | |||
04 /
FANG, Zhe 78 Ejiao Street Donge County Liaocheng Shandong 252299 / CN | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/34] |
Former [2014/32] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12863034.0 | 21.11.2012 | [2019/34] | WO2012CN01566 | Priority number, date | CN201110450564 | 29.12.2011 Original published format: CN201110450564 | [2014/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013097274 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2762012 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2762012 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/36, A61P39/06, A61K47/42, A23L33/18 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
A61K38/014 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61K35/36 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,US);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K14/78 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | A23L1/29, A61K35/36, A61P39/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVE KLEINMOLEKULARE ESELSHAUTGELATINEMISCHUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG | [2014/32] | English: | ACTIVE SMALL-MOLECULE DONKEY-HIDE GELATIN MIXTURE AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2014/32] | French: | MÉLANGE DE GÉLATINE DE CUIR D'ÂNE ACTIVE À PETITE MOLÉCULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET APPLICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2014 | Translation filed | 28.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 21.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2012 | AL | 21.08.2019 | AT | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | IE | 21.11.2019 | LU | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN101285087 (BEIJING HUADA JIERUI BIOTECHNO [CN]) [X] 1-3,11 * the whole document * [I] 4-10; | [XDI]CN1807653 (WANG JIANBAI [CN]) [XD] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4-11; | [IDY]CN101269090 (UNIV BEIJING CHEMICAL [CN]) [ID] 1-10 * examples 1-3 * [Y] 11; | [Y] - "Donkey-hide gelatin beverage prepn", DERWENT, (19970101), XP002290449 [Y] 11 * the whole document * | [T] - WANG DONGLIANG ET AL, "Chemical constituents and bioactivities of Colla corii asini.", DRUG DISCOVERIES & THERAPEUTICS OCT 2014, (201410), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1881-7831, pages 201 - 207, XP002738368 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5582/DDT.2014.01038 | International search | [X]CN101285087 (BEIJING HUADA JIERUI BIOTECHNO [CN]); | [Y]CN101269090 (UNIV BEIJING CHEMICAL [CN]); | [Y]CN102046784 (DSM IP ASSETS BV); | [A]CN1807653 (WANG JIANBAI [CN]); | [XP]CN102321716 (JIANGZHONG PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | CN1237421 | CN1807653 | CN101269090 | - ADIBI A S., AMERICA NUTRITION, (1984), vol. 25, pages 1114 - 1122 | - DBA SILK GUT, (1974), vol. 15, pages 494 - 501 |