EP2800371 - VIDEO ENCODING DEVICE, VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND VIDEO ENCODING PROGRAM, AND VIDEO DECODING DEVICE, VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND VIDEO DECODING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12, Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEHARA, Hideki c/o Intellectual Property Department JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroya c/o Intellectual Property Department JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 03 /
FUKUSHIMA, Shigeru c/o Intellectual Property Department JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12863054.8 | 28.12.2012 | WO2012JP08427 | Priority number, date | JP20110288983 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011288983 | JP20110288982 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011288982 | JP20120285808 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012285808 | JP20120285809 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012285809 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013099283 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800371 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/32 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,CN,RU,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,CN,RU,US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/503 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/513 (US);
H04N19/593 (EP,CN,RU,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | VIDEOCODIERVORRICHTUNG, VIDEOCODIERVERFAHREN UND VIDEOCODIERPROGRAMM SOWIE VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR VIDEODECODIERUNG | [2014/45] | English: | VIDEO ENCODING DEVICE, VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND VIDEO ENCODING PROGRAM, AND VIDEO DECODING DEVICE, VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND VIDEO DECODING PROGRAM | [2014/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE VIDÉO, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO ET PROGRAMME DE CODAGE VIDÉO, ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO ET PROGRAMME DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2014 | Translation filed | 11.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2020 | 15.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.07.2020 | 08.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/49] | 26.07.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP20196497.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - OUDIN S ET AL, "Cross-check of CU-based Merge Candidate List Construction", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111115), no. JCTVC-G899, XP030110883 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - KIM (ETRI) H Y ET AL, "CU-based Merge Candidate List Construction", 98. MPEG MEETING; 28-11-2011 - 2-12-2011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20111121), no. m21980, XP030050543 [X] 1-6 * section 2 * * Annex A * | [X] - WEN X ET AL, "Non-CE9 Parallel Merge/skip Mode for HEVC", 98. MPEG MEETING; 28-11-2011 - 2-12-2011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20111127), no. m21949, XP030050512 [X] 1-6 * sections 3.1 and 3.2 * | [A] - JEON Y ET AL, "Non-CE9: improvement on parallelized merge/skip mode", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111108), no. JCTVC-G164, XP030110148 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - HUI YONG KIM ET AL., "CU-based Merge Candidate List Construction", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 7TH MEETING, GENEVA, (20111121), pages 1 - 5, 10-11, XP055154449 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5909/JEB.2012.17.2.422 | [A] - J. JUNG ET AL., "Core Experiment 9: Motion Vector Coding, Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC) of ITU-T SG16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 3rd Meeting", CORE EXPERIMENT 9: MOTION VECTOR CODING, JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 3RD MEETING, GUANGZHOU, CN, (20101119), XP030047190 | [A] - MINHUA ZHOU, "CE9: Test results on parallelized merge/skip mode, Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC) of ITU-T SG16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 7th Meeting", CE9: TEST RESULTS ON PARALLELIZED MERGE/SKIP MODE, JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 7TH MEETING, GENEVA, CH, (20111109), XP030110069 | by applicant | JPH10276439 |