EP2799497 - OXYGEN-ABSORBING RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [2019/03] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyo Seikan Co., Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8640 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWA, Yoshiki c/o Toyo Seikan Group Corporate Research & Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 02 /
HIRAYAMA, Yukiko c/o Toyo Seikan Group Corporate Research & Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Toshiki c/o Toyo Seikan Group Corporate Research &Developmen t 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | [2018/37] |
Former [2014/45] | 01 /
SAWA, Yoshiki c/o Toyo Seikan Group Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRAYAMA, Yukiko c/o Toyo Seikan Group Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMADA, Toshiki c/o Toyo Seikan Group Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2014/45] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12863116.5 | 26.12.2012 | [2018/37] | WO2012JP83601 | Priority number, date | JP20110284017 | 26.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011284017 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013099921 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799497 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799497 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, B32B1/02, B32B27/18, B65D65/40, B65D81/26, C08K5/12, C08K5/20, C08K5/3417, C08L67/00 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C08K5/3417 (EP,KR,US);
C08L79/04 (KR);
B32B1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/325 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (KR);
B65D81/26 (KR);
C08G63/553 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/12 (KR);
C08K5/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/04 (EP,US);
B32B2250/05 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7244 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7248 (EP,US);
B32B2307/738 (EP,US);
B32B2439/46 (EP,US);
B32B2439/60 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
C08K2201/008 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L67/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFABSORBIERENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2014/45] | English: | OXYGEN-ABSORBING RESIN COMPOSITION | [2014/45] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ABSORBANT L'OXYGÈNE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2014 | Translation filed | 16.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 03.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.12.2012 | AL | 12.09.2018 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IE | 26.12.2018 | LU | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.12.2012 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2449959 (PETER STAUDINGER HANNS, et al); | [X]EP0214112 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [X]EP1650265 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [A]EP1953180 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]); | [E]EP2669334 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) | International search | [X]WO2005105887 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007509196 ; | [X]WO2007058313 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2007119657 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011140473 (GRAHAM PACKAGING CO [US], et al); | [XP]WO2012102086 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003521552 | JP2004161796 | JP2008038126 | JP4314637B | JP2011014844 |