EP2798020 - AQUEOUS PIGMENT DISPERSIONS BASED ON POLYURETHANE DISPERSANTS HAVING COMPONENTS TO INTERACT WITH CELLULOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company Chestnut Run Plaza 974 Center Road P.O. Box 2915 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | [2016/02] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Chad, C. 17 Gates Circle Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 02 /
JACKSON, Christian 27 Ball Farm Way Wilmington, CT 19808 / US | 03 /
MCINTYRE, Patrick, F. 1019 Radley Drive West Chester, PA 19302 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12863478.9 | 27.12.2012 | WO2012IB03082 | Priority number, date | US201161581756P | 30.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161581756 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013098652 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2798020 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/04, C08G18/12 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
C08G18/4858 (EP,US);
C09D175/00 (US);
C08G18/0819 (US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/0866 (US);
C08G18/2865 (EP,US);
C08G18/348 (EP,US);
C08G18/3831 (EP,US);
C08G18/3848 (US);
C08G18/3872 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/4854 (US);
C08G18/5024 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US);
C08G18/6692 (EP,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G18/765 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/2865 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | C09D175/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE PIGMENTDISPERSIONEN AUF BASIS VON POLYURETHANDISPERGIERMITTELN MIT KOMPONENTEN ZUR INTERAKTION MIT ZELLULOSE | [2014/45] | English: | AQUEOUS PIGMENT DISPERSIONS BASED ON POLYURETHANE DISPERSANTS HAVING COMPONENTS TO INTERACT WITH CELLULOSE | [2014/45] | French: | DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE PIGMENTS À BASE DE DISPERSANTS DE POLYURÉTHANE COMPRENANT DES COMPOSANTS POUR UNE INTERACTION AVEC DE LA CELLULOSE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 03.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/16] | 17.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6852803 (MA SHEAU-HWA [US]) [A] 1-15* column 6, lines 43-65 *; | [I]WO2009076386 (DU PONT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 41, line 23; claim 2 *; | [I]US2010143589 (SPINELLI HARRY JOSEPH [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0231]; claim 2 * | International search | [A]US2003187136 (MAIER ALOIS [DE], et al); | [A]US6632858 (PEARS DAVID ALAN [GB], et al); | [Y]US6852803 (MA SHEAU-HWA [US]); | [A]US2005182188 (RISCHE THORSTEN [DE], et al); | [A]US2007043198 (MADAJ EDMUND J [US]); | [A]US2007093618 (CHENG TAMMY [US], et al); | [A]US7220705 (HARE DONALD S [US]); | [A]US2008214729 (BUTER ROELOF [NL], et al); | [A]US2009170986 (BRUST THOMAS B [US], et al); | [Y]US2010143589 (SPINELLI HARRY JOSEPH [US], et al); | [A]US2011050784 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2011084227 (BROWN GERALD ORONDE [US], et al); | [Y]US2011245410 (ROBERTS C CHAD [US], et al) |