EP2801060 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR HIGH PERFORMANCE DESIGN OF A PROJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skidmore Owings & Merrill LLP 14 Wall Street New York, NY 10005 / US | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREZ RODRIGUEZ, Doris S. 55 South Vail Avenue Apt 1205 Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US | 02 /
MCCARTHY, Jeffrey, J. 1821 N. Lincoln Park West Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 03 /
KRICKIS, Normunds 282 Henry Street Apt. 7 Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12864378.0 | 04.12.2012 | WO2012US67760 | Priority number, date | US201213345349 | 06.01.2012 Original published format: US201213345349 | [2014/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013103463 | Date: | 11.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2801060 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06N5/00 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
Y02P90/845 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | G06N5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/46] | G06Q10/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN HOCHLEISTUNGSDESIGN EINES PROJEKTS | [2014/46] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR HIGH PERFORMANCE DESIGN OF A PROJECT | [2014/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CONCEPTION À HAUTES PERFORMANCES D'UN PROJET | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 24.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2010106674 (MCLEAN DONALD JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]EP2290599 (BANK OF AMERICA [US]); | [A]US2010324956 (LOPEZ DOUGLAS D [US], et al); | [A]US2010014441 (MIDDLETON-HAND NANCY [US], et al) |