EP2802885 - APPARATUS FOR EMPLOYING LOW OHMIC ALLOY CONDUCTORS AND METHOD FOR SIMPLIFYING CURRENT DRAIN DATA RETRIEVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elbex Video Ltd. 1-11 Nishi Gotanda 8-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELBERBAUM, David Mita 2-5-35 Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12865345.8 | 13.12.2012 | WO2012US69502 | Priority number, date | US201213349939 | 13.01.2012 Original published format: US201213349939 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013106160 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2802885 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/20, G01R19/00, G01R15/18, H01R13/717, H01F38/30, H01R13/66 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G01R15/183 (EP,US);
G01R15/18 (KR);
G01R19/00 (US);
G01R21/06 (EP,US);
H01F38/30 (EP,US);
G01R19/0092 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | G01R15/20, G01R19/00, G01R15/18, H01R13/66, H01F38/30 | ||
Former IPC [2014/47] | G01R15/20, G01R19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG NIEDEROHMIGER LEGIERUNGSLEITER, LEGIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VEREINFACHUNG DES ABRUFS VON STROMVERBRAUCHSDATEN | [2014/47] | English: | APPARATUS FOR EMPLOYING LOW OHMIC ALLOY CONDUCTORS AND METHOD FOR SIMPLIFYING CURRENT DRAIN DATA RETRIEVAL | [2014/47] | French: | APPAREIL POUR UTILISER DES CONDUCTEURS D'ALLIAGE OHMIQUE FAIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SIMPLIFIER UNE RÉCUPÉRATION DE DONNÉES DE COURANT ABSORBÉ | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 19.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2016 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 29.07.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 19.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP18210421.6 / EP3477312 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5811966 (LEE GRAHAM S [CA]) [Y] 5,6,13,14 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 33 *; | [A]US2011101956 (THORN DAVID WAYNE [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [IY]US2011276289 (PARK YOUNG JIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-4,7-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0050] - [0087] - [0202] * [Y] 5,6,13,14 | International search | [A]KR20070090740 (CHO YOUNG CHANG [KR]); | [A]WO2008006521 (THIIM APS S [DK], et al); | [A]US2010141232 (EFRAIMSSON LARS [SE], et al); | [A]US2011152102 (CLAASSEN JOHN H [US]); | [A]US2011266869 (KATRU SIVA PRASAD [IN], et al) |