EP2806231 - HOT WATER STORAGE TANK-TYPE CONDENSING BOILER HAVING MULTI-STAGE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Choi, Sung-hwan 102-302, SK Cheongamdae 64-29 Cheongam-dong Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-050 / KR | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte PartG mbB Magirus-Deutz-Straße 12 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte Küfergasse 11 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 12866258.2 | 17.09.2012 | WO2012KR07404 | Priority number, date | KR20120005977 | 19.01.2012 Original published format: KR 20120005977 | [2014/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013108977 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806231 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/36, F24H9/00, F24H1/18, F24H1/28 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
F24H1/287 (EP,US);
F24H9/00 (KR);
F24H1/186 (US);
F24H1/18 (US);
F24H1/36 (KR);
F24H8/00 (EP,US);
F24H9/0005 (US);
F24H9/0031 (EP,US);
F28D20/0034 (EP,US);
F28D7/1676 (EP,US);
F28F1/40 (EP,US);
Y02B30/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | F24H1/36, F24H9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | KONDENSIERUNGSKESSEL MIT EINEM HEISSWASSERSPEICHERTANK UND EINER MEHREBENENSTRUKTUR | [2014/48] | English: | HOT WATER STORAGE TANK-TYPE CONDENSING BOILER HAVING MULTI-STAGE STRUCTURE | [2014/48] | French: | CHAUDIÈRE À CONDENSATION DE TYPE À RÉSERVOIR DE STOCKAGE D'EAU CHAUDE DOTÉE D'UNE STRUCTURE À ÉTAGES MULTIPLES | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2014 | Translation filed | 05.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 14.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]RU2036377 (G KOOPERATIVNYJ I MOSOBLINZHPR [RU], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 1; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [I]KR100747000B (KITURAMI BOILER [KR]) [I] 1-4 * abstract *; | [I]EP0262274 (PERCEVAUT EMILE) [I] 1-3 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1, 2, 3 *; | [I]US1352802 (FAUST LOUIS F) [I] 1-3 * page 1 - page 2; figures 2, 3 *; | [I]DE29514935U (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [I] 1,4 * page 5 - page 7; figures 1, 3 *; | [Y]EP2101135 (FERROLI SPA [IT]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figure 3 * | International search | [X]KR100747000B (KITURAMI BOILER [KR]); | [A]KR20090103412 (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20110083195 (KORE INST MACH & AMP MATERIALS [KR]); | [A]KR20090063438 (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20110135438 |