EP2815061 - PISTON TRACTOR SYSTEM FOR USE IN SUBTERRANEAN WELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAY, Richard, T. 3000 North Sam Houston Parkway East Houston, TX 77032 / US | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12868510.4 | 13.02.2012 | WO2012US24914 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013122567 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815061 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B4/18, E21B23/00 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
E21B4/18 (EP,RU);
E21B19/086 (RU);
E21B23/001 (EP,RU);
E21B23/10 (RU)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | E21B19/06, E21B19/086, E21B17/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | KOLBENZUGSYSTEM FÜR UNTERIRDISCHE BOHRLÖCHER | [2014/52] | English: | PISTON TRACTOR SYSTEM FOR USE IN SUBTERRANEAN WELLS | [2014/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRACTION À PISTON À UTILISER DANS DES PUITS SOUTERRAINS | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 23.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3827512 (EDMOND T) [A] 1-15 * figures 2, 3 *; | [A]WO0036266 (WESTERN WELL TOOL INC [US]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]WO2011005107 (REELWELL AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 1, lines 21-40; figure 1 * * page 2, lines 6-15, 34-37 * * page 4, lines 32-33 *; | [A]WO2011051397 (MAERSK OIL QATAR AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 6 * | International search | [A]WO2008024925 (WESTERN WELL TOOL INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008202769 (DUPREE WADE D [US], et al); | [A]US2009159269 (SHEIRETOV TODOR K [US], et al); | [A]US2011127046 (AGUIRRE FRANZ [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2011005107 |