EP2825277 - FILTRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KX Technologies LLC 55 Railroad Avenue West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERMAN, Michael, J. 3278 Chrleston Drive Woodbury, MN 55129 / US | 02 /
BARDWELL, David, T. 1441 Clippership Court Woodbury, MN 55125 / US | 03 /
FOIX, Lori 6557 Dawn Avenue East Inver Grove Heights, MN 55076 / US | 04 /
WILSON, Steven, Karl 705 5th Avenue SW Pine City, MN 55125 / US | 05 /
HAEHN, Steven, J. 7491 31st Street N. Oakdale, MN 55128 / US | 06 /
KLIMPEL, Erik, Robert 11163 Walnut Lane Woodbury, MN 55129 / US | 07 /
BOYER LARSON, James 1935 Oak Glen Trail Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | 08 /
HUDA, Stephen 55 Wakely Street Shelton, CT 06484 / US | 09 /
FISHER, David, William 3888 Center Glen Drive Eagan, MN 55123 / US | 10 /
BRIGANO, Frank, A. 708 Tokoket Road Northford, CT 06472 / US | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Werner-Eckert-Str. 4 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/04] | Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12871085.2 | 20.12.2012 | [2018/31] | WO2012US70987 | Priority number, date | US201213422657 | 16.03.2012 Original published format: US201213422657 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013137963 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825277 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825277 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/147, B01D35/30, B01D35/00, B01D27/08, B01D27/10 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B01D35/147 (EP,CN,US);
B01D35/30 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/003 (US);
F16K17/36 (US);
B01D2201/302 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2201/307 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTRIERSYSTEM | [2015/04] | English: | FILTRATION SYSTEM | [2015/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16002725.6 / EP3184160 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2019
07.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Brita GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 4 D-65232 Taunusstein / DE Opponent's representative van Lookeren Campagne, Constantijn August, et al, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiserswerther Str. 183 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/09] |
Former [2019/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2019
ADMISSIBLE Brita GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 4 D-65232 Taunusstein / DE | 13.05.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.09.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2020 | 17.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.04.2021 | 22.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.06.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2012 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PT | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | IE | 20.12.2018 | LU | 20.12.2018 | MT | 20.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | IT | 20.12.2020 | [2021/48] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MK | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5022986 (LANG JOHN [US]) [X] 16 * figures 4,8,13,17 *[I] 17; | [XI]US5914037 (YEN CHIU-SEN [TW]) [X] 16 * figures 1,3 * [I] 17; | [A]US2006000754 (KANG WON-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [I]DE102008002727 (BRITA GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012031821 (SWAIN DAVID [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5376271 (MORGAN JR H WILLIAM [US]); | [Y]US5626746 (ROSE WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]US2006070942 (AN JAE KOOG [KR]); | [X]US2008047889 (HUDA STEPHEN P [US]); | [A]US2011247974 (GALE BRIAN D [US], et al) | Opposition | US5914037 | US6949189 | US2006000754 | US2006070942 | US2006254917 | US2007284296 | US2008156711 | US2009236272 | DE102008002727 | US2011247974 | US2012031821 | EP2570165 | - "Bayonet mount", Wikipedia, (20120315), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Bayonet_mount&oldid=481976923, XP055589432 |