EP2826021 - HIERARCHICAL MOTION ESTIMATION EMPLOYING NONLINEAR SCALING AND ADAPTIVE SOURCE BLOCK SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANNER, Jason D. 305 Turn Pike Dr Folsom, California 95630 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Hong 1058 Penniman Drive El Dorado Hills, California 95762 / US | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12871413.6 | 15.03.2012 | WO2012US29294 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013137890 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826021 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, G06T3/00, H04N19/56, H04N19/53 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
H04N19/53 (EP,US);
H04N19/56 (US);
G06T7/207 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/04] | G06T7/20, G06T3/00, H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | HIERARCHISCHEN BEWEGUNGSSCHÄTZUNG UNTER ANWENDUNG VON NICHTLINEARER SKALIERUNG UND ADAPTIVER QUELLENBLOCKGRÖSSE | [2015/04] | English: | HIERARCHICAL MOTION ESTIMATION EMPLOYING NONLINEAR SCALING AND ADAPTIVE SOURCE BLOCK SIZE | [2015/04] | French: | ESTIMATION DE MOUVEMENT HIÉRARCHIQUE EMPLOYANT UNE MISE À L'ÉCHELLE NON LINÉAIRE ET UNE TAILLE DE BLOCS-SOURCES ADAPTATIVE | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7158158 (FLEMING CHARLES G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008165850 (SAGETONG PHOOM [US], et al) [I] 1,5-15 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] - [0050] - [0053]; figure 2 *; | [I]WO2011120221 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5-7,13-15 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [I] - MARQUANT G ET AL, "EXTENDED SPATIAL SCALABILITY FOR NON DYADIC VIDEO FORMATS: FROM SDTV TO HDTV", OPTOMECHATRONIC MICRO/NANO DEVICES AND COMPONENTS III : 8 - 10 OCTOBER 2007, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE , ISSN 0277-786X], SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASH, (20050101), vol. 5960, doi:10.1117/12.631438, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 547 - 558, XP008063528 [I] 1,4-7,13-15 * Section 2. Problem to solve & methodology Section 3. Inter-layer motion prediction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.631438 | International search | [A]US2003086622 (KLEIN GUNNEWIEK REINIER BERNAR [NL], et al); | [A]US2007076020 (FLEMING CHARLES G [US], et al); | [A]US2011109803 (SHARLET DILLON [US], et al); | [A]US2011194025 (CHEN YING-RU [TW]) | by applicant | US2008165850 | WO2011120221 | - G. MARQUANT ET AL., "Extended spatial scalability for non-dyadic video formats: from SDTV to HDTV", OPTOMECHATRONIC MICRO/NANO DEVICES AND COMPONENTS, (20071008), vol. III |