EP2798162 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH FAN VARIABLE AREA NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHLENBERG, Gregory A. 45 Gianna Lane Kensington, Connecticut 06037 / US | 02 /
ZAMORA, Sean P. 37 Old Tolland Turnpike Coventry, Connecticut 06238 / US | 03 /
SCHWARZ, Frederick M. 121 Steep Hollow Drive Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12871636.2 | 28.12.2012 | WO2012US71946 | Priority number, date | US201113340798 | 30.12.2011 Original published format: US201113340798 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013141934 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2798162 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F02K3/072, F02K3/075 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
F02K1/09 (EP);
F02K3/06 (EP);
F02K3/075 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | F01D25/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTOR MIT LÜFTERDÜSE MIT VERÄNDERLICHEM BEREICH | [2014/45] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH FAN VARIABLE AREA NOZZLE | [2014/45] | French: | MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE BUSE À SECTION VARIABLE POUR UN VENTILATEUR | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 22.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/30] | 05.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2028359 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0024] , [0026] * * figures 2a,2b *; | [I]EP2157305 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0012] - [0014]; figure 1a *; | [XI]WO2008045049 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 2, lines 10-11 * * page 4, lines 13-17, 27-29 * * page 5, lines 13-19 * * figure 1a * [I] 5,9-14; | [E]EP2584184 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [E] 1-4,6-8 * paragraph [0043] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2011120080 (SCHWARK JR FRED W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2910937 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008045058 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 3, lines 4-11 * * page 4, lines 19-20 * * page 5, lines 3-28 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2138696 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1522710 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2009053058 (KOHLENBERG GREGORY A [US], et al); | [Y]US3747343 (ROSEN G) | [Y] - GUHA A., "Optimum Fan Pressure Ratio for Bypass Engines with Separate or Mixed Exhaust Streams", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, vol. 17, no. 5, (200109), pages 1117 - 1122, URL: http://www.facweb.iitkgp.ernet.in/~aguha/research/AIAA2001.pdf, (20130821), XP055090883 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2514/2.5852 | by applicant | EP2028359 | EP2157305 | WO2008045049 |