EP2829585 - FROST PREVENTIVE COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co., Ltd. 16-7 Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACHIBANA, Tetsuya c/o Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co. LTD. 16-7 Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2015/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12871673.5 | 22.03.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012JP57356 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140576 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829585 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2829585 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18, C09D5/32, C09D7/12, C09D7/00, C09K3/00 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
C09D5/32 (EP,KR,US);
C09K3/18 (KR);
C09D7/00 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | C09K3/18, C09D5/32, C09D7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FROSTSCHUTZBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2015/05] | English: | FROST PREVENTIVE COATING COMPOSITION | [2015/05] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT ANTI-GEL | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2014 | Translation filed | 31.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 24.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2012 | AL | 30.12.2015 | AT | 30.12.2015 | BE | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | IE | 22.03.2016 | LU | 22.03.2016 | GB | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | FR | 31.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 22.03.2012 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
GB | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.03.2012 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
GB | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.03.2012 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
GB | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
GB | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
GB | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
GB | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
GB | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2307422 (CABOT CORP) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-22; examples 1-12 *; | [X]US2005288385 (KONDO SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4* claims and examples *; | [X]JP2010005799 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * whole document, see abstract *; | [X]US2010314575 (GAO DI [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-7; examples page 2 ff. *; | [X]CN102382536 (UNIV TIANJIN) [X] 1-4 * whoel document, see abstract *; | [X] - FARHADI S ET AL, "Anti-icing performance of superhydrophobic surfaces", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 257, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2011.02.057, ISSN 0169-4332, (20110213), pages 6264 - 6269, (20110218), XP028368547 [X] 1-4 * Abstract; "2. Experimental"; "3. Results and discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2011.02.057 | [X] - YIJING YIN ET AL, "Preparation and properties of UV-curable polymer/nanosized indium-doped tin oxide (ITO) nanocomposite coatings", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20070406), vol. 42, no. 15, doi:10.1007/S10853-006-1133-1, ISSN 1573-4803, pages 5959 - 5963, XP019503022 [X] 1-4 * Abstract; "Experimental"; "Results and discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10853-006-1133-1 | [X] - WANG X ET AL, "Effect of antimony doped tin oxide on behaviors of waterborne polyurethane acrylate nanocomposite coatings", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 205, no. 7, ISSN 0257-8972, (20101225), pages 1864 - 1869, (20100819), XP027533882 [X] 1-4 * Abstract; "2. Experimental"; "3. Results and discussion" * | International search | [X]JP2000302998 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]WO2004044062 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009030039 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2010005799 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD); | [A]JP2010520296 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO.) | by applicant | JPS55164264 | JPH10168381 | JP2011219653 |