EP2841621 - ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION METHOD AND APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Picosun Oy Tietotie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDFORS, Sven Nuottamiehentie 8 FI-02230 Espoo / FI | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 12871801.2 | 23.03.2012 | WO2012FI50296 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140021 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841621 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
C23C16/45527 (EP,US);
C23C16/45525 (RU);
C23C16/45544 (EP,US);
C23C16/46 (EP,US);
C23C16/54 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON ATOMSCHICHTEN | [2015/10] | English: | ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION METHOD AND APPARATUSES | [2015/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREILS DE DÉPÔT DE COUCHE ATOMIQUE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 10.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010143710 (DICKEY ERIC R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * [I] 4-8,10-15; | [XI]US2008157654 (COK RONALD S [US]) [X] 1,7,9,13 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 56] * [I] 2-6,8,10-12,14,15; | [XI]US7521356 (RAMASWAMY NIRMAL [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * col. 3, l. 52 - col. 4, l. 11 col. 10, l. 45-57 col. 14, l. 20-21;; figure 1 * [I] 2-8,11-15; | [X]WO2012028771 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 4; lines 23-35 *; | [X]WO2012028776 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 3 *; | [A]US2009297710 (LINDFORS SVEN [FI]) [A] 4-6,11,12 * paragraphs [0042] , [0045] *; | [A]US2011268891 (MACNEIL JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 8,14 * paragraph [0034] * | International search | [X]WO2012028776 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al); | [X]US2010143710 (DICKEY ERIC R [US], et al); | [X]US7750558 (COK RONALD S [US]); | [A]US2003072882 (NIINISTO JAAKKO [FI], et al); | [A]US2003170403 (DOAN TRUNG TRI [US], et al); | [A]WO2007060295 (PLANAR SYSTEMS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO2009144371 (PICOSUN OY [FI], et al) |