EP2828748 - METHOD IN A PROCESSOR, AN APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÄHTEENMÄKI, Mika Paavo Kolin katu 1 A 1 FI-33720 Tampere / FI | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 12872051.3 | 21.03.2012 | WO2012FI50284 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140018 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828748 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F9/38, G06F9/48, G06F9/45 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G06F9/5083 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (US);
G06F8/47 (EP,US);
G06F9/5044 (EP,US);
G06F9/505 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | G06F9/50, G06F9/38, G06F9/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN IN EINEM PROZESSOR, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD IN A PROCESSOR, AN APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DANS UN PROCESSEUR, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004098718 (YOSHII KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraph [0231] - paragraph [0232]; figure 21 * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0 92] , [0 99] , [ 113] , [ 130] , [ 224] , [ 232] *[I] 2-12,15 | International search | [X]US2005081183 (ACCAPADI JOS MANUEL [US], et al); | [X]US2005210472 (ACCAPADI JOS M [US], et al); | [X]US2009164399 (BELL JR ROBERT H [US], et al) |