EP2832101 - COMPLEMENTING CONSUMPTION OF MEDIA CONTENT USING A DISPLAY DEVICE WITH A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Jiqiang 8F Raycom Infotech Park A No.2 KeXueYuan, South Road ZhongGuanCun, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
LI, Wenlong 4-502 Building 18 Tiantongyuan West 2 District Changping District Beijing 102218 / CN | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Rummler, Felix R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12873439.9 | 30.03.2012 | WO2012CN73326 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013143125 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832101 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/23 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
H04N21/4122 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/44 (US);
H04N21/4126 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4222 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | ERGÄNZUNG DES VERBRAUCHS VON MEDIENINHALTEN MIT EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2015/06] | English: | COMPLEMENTING CONSUMPTION OF MEDIA CONTENT USING A DISPLAY DEVICE WITH A MOBILE DEVICE | [2015/06] | French: | COMPLÉMENTATION DE LA CONSOMMATION DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE AVEC UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 20.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2008133759 (WEEL MARTIN [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0088] * * figure 1 * * figure 4 * [A] 11,15 [I] 3-5,7-9; | [XI]US2010169514 (NOGUCHI KEI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10-12,15 * figure 4 * [I] 3,4,6-9,13,14; | [A]US8108535 (ROBERTS THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 3* column 5, paragraph 51 - paragraph 54 * | International search | [A]JP2001352373 (NINTENDO CO LTD); | [A]US6636918 (AGUILAR MAXIMINO [US], et al); | [A]WO2007145014 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP], et al); | [A]CN201422128Y (XIAMEN 35 COM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN102118499 (SHENZHEN COSHIP SOFTWARE CO LTD); | [A]CN201986047U (XIAMEN CITY LINKTOP TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | by applicant | US2008133759 | US2010169514 |