EP2763479 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM ONTO WHICH INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM IS RECORDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Rakuten, Inc. 4-12-3, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | ||
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Rakuten Edy Inc. Shinagawa Seaside Rakuten Tower 4-12-3 Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKATAKE Masashi c/o Rakuten Inc. 4-12-3 Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
ISHII Hiromitsu c/o Rakuten Inc. 4-12-3 Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12873474.6 | 28.12.2012 | [2016/48] | WO2012JP84184 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014103053 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763479 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2763479 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2763479 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H04W16/18, H04W48/18, // H04W8/18 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H04W16/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (KR,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W64/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | H04W64/00, H04W16/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM MIT DEM DARAUF GESPEICHERTEN INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2014/32] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM ONTO WHICH INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM IS RECORDED | [2014/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT SUR LEQUEL EST ENREGISTRÉ LE PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2013 | Translation filed | 08.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 26.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2012 | AL | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | IS | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | IE | 28.12.2016 | LU | 28.12.2016 | MT | 28.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 28.12.2016 | ||
MT | 28.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 28.12.2016 | ||
MT | 28.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 28.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 28.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 28.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 30.11.2016 | |
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 30.11.2016 | |
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 30.11.2016 | |
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1655980 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]WO2011131175 (LINZ JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 22 - line 29 * * page 3, line 4 - line 38 * | International search | [A]JP2012205020 (KDDI CORP); | [A]JP2010124222 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | by applicant | JPH0836041 |