EP2850973 - MECHANISM FOR CONVERTING A SOFT FURNITURE ITEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chesnokov, Dmitry Vladimirovich Kolomenskaya naberezhnaya 12-58 Moscow 115142 / RU | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUZNETSOV, Aleksandr Viktorovich p. Novie Rzhavki 15-205 Solnechnogorsky raion Moskovskaya oblast 141552 / RU | 02 /
CHESNOKOV, Dmitry Vladimirovich Kolomenskaya naberezhnaya 12-58 Moscow 115142 / RU | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas, et al Maxingstraße 34 1130 Wien / AT | [2015/13] | Application number, filing date | 12875104.7 | 09.11.2012 | [2016/42] | WO2012RU00919 | Priority number, date | EA20120000623 | 23.04.2012 Original published format: EA 201200623 | [2015/13] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013162410 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | RU | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2850973 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2850973 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47C17/13 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
A47C17/134 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS ZUR UMWANDLUNG EINES WEICHEN MÖBELELEMENTS | [2015/13] | English: | MECHANISM FOR CONVERTING A SOFT FURNITURE ITEM | [2015/13] | French: | MÉCANISME DE TRANSFORMATION D'OBJET DE MOBILIER MOU | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2014 | Translation filed | 21.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 21.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2015/13] | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 11.02.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2012 | AL | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | MT | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | RS | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | IE | 09.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | GB | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 09.11.2012 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.11.2012 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 19.10.2016 | |
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 19.10.2016 | |
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8804837U (STANZWERK WETTER SICHELSCHMIDT & CO) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]RU2340269 (PROIZV OB ALLEGRO KLASSIKA AOZ) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]US1732522 (MARTIN) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]EP0245219 (ZORZETTO RENATO STEMA SAS) [A] 1-5 * figure - * | International search | [A]AT399812B (HOPPE KG HODRY METALLFAB [AT]); | [A]US2003088916 (DE LORENZO STELIO [IT]); | [A]RU2340269 (PROIZV OB ALLEGRO KLASSIKA AOZ [RU]); | [A]US2009235452 (HOFFMAN D STEPHEN [US], et al) |